EP3915747 - QUICK CLAMPING DEVICE, GRANULATING DEVICE WITH SUCH A QUICK CLAMPING DEVICE, CLAMPING METHOD AND TENSIONING LEVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, FR | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordson Corporation 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, OH 44145-1119 / US | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnellbach, Nikolai 48308 Senden / DE | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20176919.7 | 27.05.2020 | [2021/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915747 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3915747 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29B9/06, E05C19/14, // B29C48/00, B29C48/25 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B29B9/065 (EP,US);
F16B2/185 (US);
E05C19/14 (EP);
B29C48/0022 (EP);
B29C48/256 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | B29B9/06, E05C19/14, B01J2/20, F16B2/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHNELLSPANNVORRICHTUNG, GRANULIERVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER SOLCHEN SCHNELLSPANNVORRICHTUNG, BETREFFENDES VERSPANNVERFAHREN UND SPANNHEBEL | [2021/48] | English: | QUICK CLAMPING DEVICE, GRANULATING DEVICE WITH SUCH A QUICK CLAMPING DEVICE, CLAMPING METHOD AND TENSIONING LEVER | [2021/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE RAPIDE, DISPOSITIF DE GRANULATION DOTÉ D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE RAPIDE, PROCÉDÉ DE SERRAGE ASSOCIÉ ET LEVIER DE SERRAGE | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 01.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | IE | 27.05.2023 | LU | 27.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | FR | 31.05.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 15.03.2023 | |
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
IE | 27.05.2023 | ||
LU | 27.05.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 15.03.2023 | |
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
LU | 27.05.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
LU | 27.05.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 15.03.2023 | |
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4116933 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER [DE]) [X] 1-11,16-27 * column 1, lines 3-5 * * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 6 * * figures 1-3; claims 1-7 * * abstract * [Y] 12-15; | [A]DE102009057781 (AUTOMATIK PLASTICS MACHINERY [DE]) [A] 1-27 * abstract *; | [XY]CN103273586 (ZHANGJIAGANG CITY YILI MACHINERY CO LTD) [X] 1-11,16-27 * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] - [0018] * * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 * [Y] 12-15; | [Y]FR3025845 (EVEILLE MARC JACQUES [FR]) [Y] 12,15 * page 2, lines 37-40 * * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 * * abstract *; | [Y]EP3050839 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [Y] 13,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0026] , [0027] * * figures 1-6; claims 1-7 * * abstract *; | [XY]CN208392593U (NANJING YONGJIE CHEMICAL MACHINERY MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-11,16-27 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0027] - [0035] - [0045] * * figures 1-4; claims 1-8 * [Y] 12-15; | [A]EP3511139 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [A] 1-27* abstract *; | [XY]CN209320046U (WUXI SANXI GUM BASE MFT CO LTD) [X] 1-11,16-27 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0027] - [0034] - [0045] * * figures 1-3; claims 1-8 * [Y] 12-15 |