EP3744387 - VEHICLE WITH PEDALS COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/49] | VEHICLE WITH PEDALS COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL STIMULATION AND METHOD FOR ELECTRICAL STIMULATION IMPLEMENTED BY SUCH A VEHICLE | ||
[2023/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GBY SA Route de Bulle 41 1696 Vuisternens-en-Ogoz / CH | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobler, Sebastian La Couta 15 1726 Farvagny-le-Petit / CH | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 20176951.0 | 27.05.2020 | [2020/49] | Priority number, date | CH20190000686 | 27.05.2019 Original published format: CH 6862019 | [2020/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744387 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744387 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61H1/02, B62K3/16, // A61N1/05, A63B21/00, A63B22/06, A63B23/035, A61N1/04 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
A61H1/0274 (EP);
A61N1/36003 (EP,CH);
A61H1/0214 (EP);
A61H1/0237 (EP);
A61H39/002 (EP);
A61N1/36014 (CH);
A61N1/36031 (CH);
A63B22/06 (CH);
A63B23/03558 (CH);
B62K5/003 (CH);
B62K5/023 (EP,CH);
B62K5/05 (EP);
B62K5/08 (EP);
B62M1/12 (EP);
A61N1/0492 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] |
Former [2020/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRETFAHRZEUG (MIT PEDALEN), DAS EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTRISCHEN STIMULATION UMFASST | [2023/17] | English: | VEHICLE WITH PEDALS COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL STIMULATION | [2023/17] | French: | VÉHICULE À PÉDALES COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE STIMULATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/17] |
Former [2020/49] | TRETFAHRZEUG (MIT PEDALEN), DAS EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTRISCHEN STIMULATION UMFASST, UND ELEKTRISCHE STIMULATIONSMETHODE, DIE DURCH EIN SOLCHES FAHRZEUG UMGESETZT WIRD | ||
Former [2020/49] | VEHICLE WITH PEDALS COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL STIMULATION AND METHOD FOR ELECTRICAL STIMULATION IMPLEMENTED BY SUCH A VEHICLE | ||
Former [2020/49] | VÉHICULE À PÉDALES COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE STIMULATION ÉLECTRIQUE ET MÉTHODE DE STIMULATION ÉLECTRIQUE MISE EN OEUVRE PAR UN TEL VÉHICULE | Examination procedure | 03.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 03.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4499900 (PETROFSKY JERROLD S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** column 1, line 49 - page 2, line 9 *; | [A]US4863157 (MENDEL FRANK C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0228700 (BERKELMANS HENRICUS WILHELMUS [NL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 - page 4, line 20 * * page 5, line 6 - page 7, line 11 *; | [A]WO2019066426 (Y & J BIO CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US4863157 | WO0228700 | US2004259693 | WO2014136852 | KR20140128487 | US8923978 | US9114255 | KR20170098058 |