EP3757090 - NOVEL LIPIDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arbutus Biopharma Corporation 25th Floor 700 West Georgia Street Vancouver, BC V7Y 1B3 / CA | [2023/24] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Arbutus Biopharma Corporation 100- 8900 Glenlyon Parkway Burnaby, BC V5J 5J8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manoharan, Muthiah c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02142 / US | 02 /
Jayaraman, Muthusamy c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02142 / US | 03 /
Rajeev, Kallanthottathil, G. c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02142 / US | 04 /
Eltepu, Laxman c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02142 / US | 05 /
Ansell, Steven c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02142 / US | 06 /
Chen, Jianxin c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02142 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/24] |
Former [2021/01] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20177336.3 | 10.11.2009 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US20080113179P | 10.11.2008 Original published format: US 113179 P | US20090154350P | 20.02.2009 Original published format: US 154350 P | US20090171439P | 21.04.2009 Original published format: US 171439 P | US20090185438P | 09.06.2009 Original published format: US 185438 P | US20090225898P | 15.07.2009 Original published format: US 225898 P | US20090234098P | 14.08.2009 Original published format: US 234098 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757090 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3757090 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | [2023/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3757090 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D317/46, A61K31/713, A61P33/00, A61K9/127, A61K31/7088, A61P37/04, C07D203/10, C07D317/28, C07D317/44, C07D405/12, C07D317/72, C07D491/056, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, C07D319/06, C07D491/113, C12N15/11 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A61K9/1272 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/44 (IL,KR,US);
A61K47/543 (KR);
A61K47/10 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7105 (CN,KR);
A61K31/713 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K39/39 (IL,KR,US);
A61K47/18 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/20 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/22 (CN,KR);
A61K47/28 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K48/0033 (CN,KR);
A61K9/5123 (KR);
A61P33/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL,KR);
C07C219/06 (KR);
C07C219/20 (KR);
C07C229/08 (IL,KR,US);
C07C229/30 (IL,KR,US);
C07C237/16 (IL,KR,US);
C07C251/38 (IL,KR,US);
C07C251/78 (IL,KR,US);
C07C271/12 (IL,KR,US);
C07C271/20 (IL,KR,US);
C07C323/25 (IL,KR,US);
C07D203/10 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D233/64 (KR);
C07D317/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D317/44 (EP,IL,US);
C07D317/46 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D317/72 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D319/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D491/056 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D491/113 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07F9/65515 (KR);
C12N15/111 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/113 (IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/55555 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/55561 (CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/14 (CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/3515 (CN,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | C07D203/10, C07D317/28, C07D317/44, C07D317/72, C07D319/06, C07D405/12, C07D491/056, C07D491/113, A61K47/00, A61K31/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE LIPIDE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON THERAPEUTIKA | [2021/01] | English: | NOVEL LIPIDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTICS | [2021/01] | French: | NOUVEAUX LIPIDES ET COMPOSITIONS D'ADMINISTRATION D'AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/49] | 30.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/51] | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/51] | 30.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09825609.2 / EP2355851 | EP17001160.5 / EP3284482 | Divisional application(s) | EP23175192.6 / EP4241767 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.12.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees PL, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 30.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 30.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2021 | Decision despatched | 30.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3402146 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [I]US6320017 (ANSELL STEVEN MICHIAL [CA]); | [E]WO2010042877 (TEKMIRA PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [CA], et al); | [E]WO2010068816 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US3687808 | US3993754 | US4145410 | US4224179 | US4235871 | US4469863 | US4522803 | US4587044 | US4588578 | US4603044 | US4605735 | WO8604920 | WO8702062 | US4667025 | US4737323 | US4762779 | US4789737 | US4824941 | US4828979 | US4835263 | US4876335 | US4904582 | EP0360257 | US4948882 | US4957773 | US4958013 | US4987071 | WO9103162 | US5013556 | US5023243 | US5059528 | US5082830 | US5109124 | WO9207065 | US5112963 | US5116739 | US5118802 | US5130302 | US5138045 | US5142047 | US5149782 | WO9220822 | WO9220823 | US5168045 | US5177189 | US5177198 | US5182364 | US5214136 | US5218105 | US5223618 | WO9315187 | US5235033 | US5245022 | US5254469 | US5256775 | US5258506 | US5262536 | US5264562 | US5264564 | WO9323569 | US5272250 | WO9402595 | US5286634 | US5292873 | US5317098 | WO9413688 | US5334711 | US5359044 | US5366878 | US5371241 | US5378825 | US5386023 | US5391723 | US5414077 | US5416203 | US5451463 | US5457191 | US5459255 | US5473039 | US5476925 | US5484908 | US5486603 | US5489677 | US5508270 | WO9611266 | US5510475 | US5512439 | US5512667 | US5514785 | US5519134 | US5525472 | US5525465 | US5532130 | US5534499 | US5539083 | US5541313 | US5545730 | US5552538 | US5567810 | US5574142 | US5578717 | US5578718 | US5580731 | US5585481 | US5587371 | US5591317 | US5591584 | US5595726 | US5597696 | US5599923 | US5599928 | US5608046 | US5610288 | US5614617 | US5631359 | US5672685 | US5672662 | US5688941 | US5714166 | US5718709 | US5721114 | US5739119 | US5747470 | US5759829 | US5783683 | US5789573 | US5801154 | US5820873 | US5834596 | US5840688 | US5876968 | US5885613 | US5976567 | US6004925 | US6027726 | US6037323 | US6046166 | WO0044895 | US6153737 | US6172208 | US6287591 | US6300319 | WO0175164 | US6320017 | US6335434 | US6335437 | US6372886 | US6395437 | WO0244321 | US6444806 | US6486308 | US6525031 | US6528631 | US6559279 | US6858225 | WO2007095387 | WO2008036825 | US19790611131 | US19500611543 | US19390611714 | US19380611854 | US19980612258 | US19980612340 | WO1992US04294 | WO1992US04305 | EP19920110298 | US19950486214 | WO2004US07070 | US20040916185 | US20040946873 | US20050115989 | US20070657341 | US20070833934 | US20070944227 | US20090502158 |