EP3772139 - CONNECTOR FOR PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Renhe Photovoltaic Technology Co., Ltd. No.5, Sitangjiang Rd., Xinpu Town Cixi Zhejiang / CN | [2021/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUAN, Lijun No.5, Sitangjiang Rd.,Xinpu Town Cixi, Zhejiang / CN | 02 /
SU, Li No.5, Sitangjiang Rd.,Xinpu Town Cixi, Zhejiang / CN | [2021/05] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2021/05] | Application number, filing date | 20177647.3 | 01.06.2020 | [2021/05] | Priority number, date | CN201910688127 | 29.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910688127 | [2021/05] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3772139 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3772139 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/426, H01R13/59, H02S40/36, // H01R13/52, H01R101/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H01R13/426 (EP);
H01R13/46 (KR);
H01R13/02 (CN,US);
H01R13/42 (US);
H01R13/40 (CN);
H01R13/502 (CN,US);
H01R13/59 (EP,US);
H01R24/00 (CN,US);
H02S40/34 (CN,US);
H02S40/36 (EP);
H01R13/5205 (EP);
H01R2101/00 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/05] | H01R13/426, H01R13/59, // H01R13/52, H01R101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] |
Former [2021/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBINDER FÜR PHOTOVOLTAISCHE ZELLE | [2021/05] | English: | CONNECTOR FOR PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL | [2021/05] | French: | CONNECTEUR POUR CELLULE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE | [2021/05] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3808590 (HEMMER V, et al); | [Y]CN204558736U (JIANGSU WINTERSUN ENERGY SAVING SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [L]CN209844042U (ZHEJIANG RENHE PHOTOVOLTAIC TECH CO LTD) | Examination | US2012149227 |