EP3756658 - OMEGA -3 COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aker BioMarine Human Ingredients AS P.O. Box 496 1327 Lysaker / NO | [2024/41] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states AKER BIOMARINE ANTARCTIC AS J.M.Johansens vei 99 8340 Stamsund / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOEM, Nils Skovveien 6a N-0257 Oslo / NO | 02 /
BURRI, Lena Stormyrveien 1 N-0672 Oslo / NO | 03 /
BERGE, Kjetil Toftes Gate 2 N-0556 Oslo / NO | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20177787.7 | 24.09.2013 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201261704854P | 24.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261704854 P | US201261739260P | 19.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261739260 P | US201361775032P | 08.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361775032 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3756658 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61P9/00, A61P25/24, A61P25/28, A61K31/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/685 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OMEGA-3-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2021/01] | English: | OMEGA -3 COMPOSITIONS | [2021/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'OMÉGA-3 | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 01.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13836209.0 / EP2897595 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 01.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.10.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.10.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 01.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008274203 (BRUHEIM INGE [NO], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0077]; example -; claim - *[I] 3-6,8; | [XI]US2011223246 (OPHEIM JOAR [US]) [X] 1-4,8-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0029]; example -; claim - * [I] 5-7 | by applicant | US5656667 | WO2006054183 | WO2008060163 | WO2008117602 | WO2009139641 | - GRUPP et al., J. Mol. Cell. Cardiol., (19990000), vol. 31, pages 297 - 303 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Maack Publishing Co. |