EP3731463 - EXTENSION OF NETWORK CONTROL SYSTEM INTO PUBLIC CLOUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicira Inc. 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDRASHEKHAR, Ganesan 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA California 94304 / US | 02 /
HIRA, Mukesh 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA California 94304 / US | 03 /
KATREKAR, Akshay 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA California 94304 / US | 04 /
WANG, Su 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA California 94304 / US | 05 /
YU, Jia 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA California 94304 / US | 06 /
SHAH, Saurabh 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA California 94304 / US | 07 /
PILLAI, Sanal 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA California 94304 / US | 08 /
JIAN, Jayant 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA California 94304 / US | 09 /
ZHANG, Ronghua 4438 Manzanita Drive San Jose, CA California 95129 / US | 10 /
KULKARNI, Vaibhav Vmware Software India Pvt. Ltd Baijaj Brandview Level 8 Wakdewaddi 411005 Pune / IN | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 20177886.7 | 17.01.2017 | [2020/44] | Priority number, date | US201662380411P | 27.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662380411 P | US201615253829 | 31.08.2016 Original published format: US201615253829 | US201615253833 | 31.08.2016 Original published format: US201615253833 | IN201641029739 | 31.08.2016 Original published format: IN201641029739 | US201615253832 | 31.08.2016 Original published format: US201615253832 | US201615253834 | 31.08.2016 Original published format: US201615253834 | US201615279394 | 28.09.2016 Original published format: US201615279394 | US201615279409 | 28.09.2016 Original published format: US201615279409 | US201615279403 | 28.09.2016 Original published format: US201615279403 | US201615279382 | 28.09.2016 Original published format: US201615279382 | US201615367155 | 01.12.2016 Original published format: US201615367155 | US201615367157 | 01.12.2016 Original published format: US201615367157 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3731463 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3731463 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L29/06, H04L12/931, G06F9/455, G06F9/50, H04L29/08, H04L29/12, H04L12/741, H04L12/803, H04W28/02 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
H04L41/0806 (EP,CN);
G06F9/45558 (EP,CN);
G06F9/5072 (CN);
G06F9/5077 (EP,CN);
H04L41/044 (EP);
H04L41/046 (EP,CN);
H04L41/0893 (EP,CN);
H04L41/0894 (EP,CN);
H04L41/0895 (EP,CN);
H04L41/40 (EP);
H04L45/74 (EP,CN);
H04L47/125 (EP,CN);
H04L61/2592 (EP,CN);
H04L63/0236 (CN);
H04L63/0263 (EP);
H04L63/0272 (EP);
H04L63/0428 (EP);
H04L63/20 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | H04L12/24, H04L12/931, G06F9/455, G06F9/50, H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2020/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ERWEITERUNG EINES NETZWERKSTEUERUNGSSYSTEMS IN EINE ÖFFENTLICHE CLOUD | [2020/44] | English: | EXTENSION OF NETWORK CONTROL SYSTEM INTO PUBLIC CLOUD | [2020/44] | French: | EXTENSION D'UN SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE RÉSEAU DANS UN NUAGE PUBLIC | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 22.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17702996.4 / EP3485610 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.03.2022 | AT | 30.03.2022 | CZ | 30.03.2022 | DK | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | ES | 30.03.2022 | FI | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | IT | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | MC | 30.03.2022 | NL | 30.03.2022 | PL | 30.03.2022 | RO | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SE | 30.03.2022 | SI | 30.03.2022 | SK | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | NO | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | PT | 01.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/35] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | |
NO | 30.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013058335 (KOPONEN TEEMU [US], et al); | [A]US2014337500 (LEE JAUSHIN [US]); | [I]US2016212049 (DAVIE BRUCE [US]) | by applicant | US2015172331 | US2016105488 | US2016226759 | US2016226754 | US19380623803 |