EP3838383 - METHOD FOR EXTRACTING LONG CHAIN DICARBOXYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/25] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EXTRACTING LONG CHAIN DICARBOXYLIC ACID | ||
[2024/45] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - German title | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - English title | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - French title | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cathay Biotech Inc. 4th Floor, Building 5 1690 Cailun Road Zhangjiang Hitech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | For all designated states CIBT America Inc. 200 Continental Drive, Suite 401 Newark, DE 19713 / US | For all designated states Cathay (Jinxiang) Biomaterial Co., Ltd. New Material Industry Park Huji Town Jinxiang County Jining, Shandong 272200 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Cathay Biotech Inc. 4th Floor, Building 5 1690 Cailun Road Zhangjiang Hitech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
For all designated states CIBT America Inc. 200 Continental Drive, Suite 401 Newark, DE 19713 / US | |||
For all designated states Cathay (Jinxiang) Biomaterial Co., Ltd. New Material Industry Park Huji town Jinxiang county Jining Shangdong 272200 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Chen c/o Cathay Biotech Inc. 4th Floor, Building 5, 1690 Cailun Road Zhangjiang Hitech Park, Pudong New District Shanghai, 20120 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Shuhua c/o Cathay Biotech Inc. 4th Floor, Building 5, 1690 Cailun Road Zhangjiang Hitech Park, Pudong New District Shanghai, 20120 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Yufeng c/o Cathay Biotech Inc. 4th Floor, Building 5, 1690 Cailun Road Zhangjiang Hitech Park, Pudong New District Shanghai, 20120 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Xiucai c/o Cathay Biotech Inc. 4th Floor, Building 5, 1690 Cailun Road Zhangjiang Hitech Park, Pudong New District Shanghai, 20120 / CN | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 20178388.3 | 04.06.2020 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | CN201911320839 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911320839 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838383 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/14, B01D61/18, B01D61/58, B01D9/00, C07C51/42, C07C55/02, C07C51/41, C07C51/43, C07C51/47 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
B01D9/005 (EP);
C07C51/42 (CN);
B01D61/58 (EP,US);
B01D11/02 (US);
B01D61/149 (EP,CN,US);
B01D9/0004 (EP);
C07C51/41 (EP);
C07C51/43 (EP);
C07C51/47 (EP);
C08G69/26 (CN);
C12P7/44 (US);
B01D2311/263 (US);
B01D2311/2642 (US);
B01D2311/2643 (EP);
B01D61/027 (US);
B01D61/145 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/41, C07C55/02 (EP);
C07C51/41, C07C55/21 (EP);
C07C51/42, C07C55/02 (CN);
C07C51/42, C07C55/21 (CN);
C07C51/43, C07C55/02 (EP);
C07C51/43, C07C55/21 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EXTRAKTION VON LANGKETTIGEN DICARBONSÄUREN | [2024/45] | English: | METHOD FOR EXTRACTING LONG CHAIN DICARBOXYLIC ACID | [2024/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION D'ACIDES DICARBOXYLIQUES À CHAÎNE LONGUE | [2024/45] |
Former [2021/25] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR EXTRAKTION VON LANGKETTIGEN DICARBONSÄUREN | ||
Former [2021/25] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EXTRACTING LONG CHAIN DICARBOXYLIC ACID | ||
Former [2021/25] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'EXTRACTION D'ACIDE DICARBOXYLIQUE À CHAÎNE LONGUE | Examination procedure | 04.06.2020 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]CN1570124 (SHANGHAI KAISAI BIOTECHNOLOGY [CN]); | [XY]US2013116471 (YAN LIMING [CN], et al); | [Y]DE102015216815 (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE], et al); | [A]CN108017535 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEM CORP, et al) | by applicant | CN1570124 | CN102476987 |