EP3725971 - AN UNDERROOF COLLAR FOR USE IN WATER-PROOFING THE JOINT BETWEEN A ROOF STRUCTURE AND A WINDOW FRAME, A PACKED UNDERROOF COLLAR, AND A METHOD OF PROVIDING AN UNDERROOF COLLAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VKR Holding A/S Breeltevej 18 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atzen, Bent c/o VKR Holding A/S Breeltevej 18 2970 Hørsholm / DK | 02 /
Henriksen, Jens-Ulrik Holst c/o VKR Holding A/S Breeltevej 18 2970 Hørsholm / DK | 03 /
Erdmann, Lars c/o VKR Holding A/S Breeltevej 18 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 20179291.8 | 16.05.2018 | [2020/43] | Priority number, date | DK2017PA70342 | 16.05.2017 Original published format: DK PA201770342 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725971 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3725971 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/147, E04D13/03 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
E04D13/1475 (EP);
E04D13/147 (DK);
E04D13/0305 (US);
E04D1/36 (US);
E04D13/03 (DK);
E04D13/031 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2020/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UNTERDACHMANSCHETTE ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR DIE WASSERDICHTE VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN EINER DACHSTRUKTUR UND EINEM FENSTERRAHMEN, VERPACKTE UNTERDACHMANSCHETTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER UNTERDACHMANSCHETTE | [2020/43] | English: | AN UNDERROOF COLLAR FOR USE IN WATER-PROOFING THE JOINT BETWEEN A ROOF STRUCTURE AND A WINDOW FRAME, A PACKED UNDERROOF COLLAR, AND A METHOD OF PROVIDING AN UNDERROOF COLLAR | [2020/43] | French: | COLLIER DE SOUS-TOIT DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS L'IMPERMÉABILISATION DU JOINT ENTRE UNE STRUCTURE DE TOIT ET UN CADRE DE FENÊTRE, COLLIER DE SOUS-TOIT REPLIÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'UN COLLIER DE SOUS-TOIT | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 21.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18726411.4 / EP3625406 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | ES | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | TR | 16.02.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | IE | 16.05.2022 | LU | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | IS | 17.06.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | DK | 16.02.2022 | |
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
PT | 16.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9528537 (POLYSHEET AS [DK], et al); | [X]DE9413970U (KLOEBER JOHANNES [DE]); | [X]DE29908614U (DOERKEN EWALD AG [DE]); | [X]WO2006002629 (VKR HOLDING AS [DK], et al); | by applicant | EP0994992 | EP2284329 | EP2952646 |