EP3760225 - NOVEL PEPTIDES AND COMBINATION OF PEPTIDES FOR USE IN IMMUNOTHERAPY AGAINST LUNG CANCER, INCLUDING NSCLC AND OTHER CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immatics Biotechnologies GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHR, Andrea Horemer 17 72076 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
WEINSCHENK, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | 03 /
SCHOOR, Oliver Eichhaldenstrasse 19 72074 Tübingen / DE | 04 /
FRITSCHE, Jens Lärchenweg 11 72144 Dussilingen / DE | 05 /
SINGH, Harpreet 5122 Morningside Dr. Apt. 525 Houston, TX 77005 / US | 06 /
WAGNER, Claudia Nürtinger Strasse 32 72074 Tübingen / DE | 07 /
LEIBOLD, Julia Wiesenweg 1 6336 Langkampfen / AT | 08 /
SONG, Colette Willi-Baumeister-Weg 21 73760 Ostfildern / DE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 20179381.7 | 22.04.2016 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | GB20150007030 | 24.04.2015 Original published format: GB 201507030 | US201562152258P | 24.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562152258 P | [2021/01] | Previously filed application, date | EP20160059053 | 22.04.2016 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3760225 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3760225 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K14/47, C07K16/00, A61P35/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
A61K35/17 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07K14/4748 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07K14/70539 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K39/4613 (KR);
A61K39/4615 (KR);
A61K39/4632 (KR);
A61K39/464499 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61P35/02 (CN,KR);
C07K14/7051 (IL,RU,US);
C07K14/70514 (KR);
C07K14/70517 (KR);
C07K16/2833 (IL,KR,RU,US);
C07K16/30 (IL,KR,RU,US);
C12N15/115 (KR,RU);
C12N15/85 (CN);
C12N5/0636 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C12N5/0638 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
C12N5/0639 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C12Q1/6886 (IL,US);
G01N33/57492 (IL,US);
G16B20/20 (IL,US);
A61K2039/5154 (KR);
A61K2039/804 (CN);
A61K2039/812 (CN);
A61K2039/82 (CN);
A61K2039/828 (CN);
A61K2039/836 (CN);
A61K2039/844 (CN);
A61K2039/852 (CN);
A61K2039/86 (CN);
A61K2039/868 (CN);
A61K2039/876 (CN);
A61K2039/884 (CN);
A61K2039/892 (CN);
A61K2239/31 (KR);
A61K2239/46 (KR);
A61K2239/55 (KR);
C07K2319/00 (CN,IL,US);
C07K2319/30 (IL,US);
C07K2319/33 (IL,US);
C07K2319/55 (IL,US);
C07K2319/74 (IL,US);
C12N2310/16 (KR);
C12N2501/50 (IL,US);
C12N2510/00 (CN);
C12N2800/107 (CN);
C12Q2600/106 (IL,US);
C12Q2600/112 (IL,US);
C12Q2600/156 (IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | 16.06.2020 | ME | 16.06.2020 | Validation states | MA | 16.06.2020 | MD | 16.06.2020 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE PEPTIDE UND KOMBINATION VON PEPTIDEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER IMMUNTHERAPIE GEGEN LUNGENKREBS, EINSCHLIESSLICH NSCLC UND ANDERE KREBSERKRANKUNGEN | [2021/01] | English: | NOVEL PEPTIDES AND COMBINATION OF PEPTIDES FOR USE IN IMMUNOTHERAPY AGAINST LUNG CANCER, INCLUDING NSCLC AND OTHER CANCERS | [2021/01] | French: | NOUVEAUX PEPTIDES ET COMBINAISON DE PEPTIDES À UTILISER DANS L'IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE DU CANCER DU POUMON, Y COMPRIS LE CPNPC ET D'AUTRES CANCERS | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 23.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16717663.5 / EP3285801 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009015842 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al); | [XY]WO2011113819 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]WO2015018805 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]); | by applicant | US4342566 | US4440859 | US4530901 | US4582800 | US4677063 | US4678751 | US4704362 | US4710463 | US4757006 | US4766075 | US4810648 | US4816567 | US4897445 | WO9429348 | WO9518145 | WO9726328 | US5849589 | WO0172768 | US6406705 | WO03068201 | WO03070752 | WO2004033685 | WO2004074322 | WO2004084798 | WO2007028574 | EP1760088 | EP2112253 | US2010113300 | WO2012056407 | US2013096016 | WO2013057586 | US2013115191 | WO2014071978 | WO2014191359 |