EP3922139 - DETERGENT ARTICLES DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN WONTERGHEM, Lucresse Gemma 1853 Brussels / BE | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20179691.9 | 12.06.2020 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922139 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3922139 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47F1/035, // C11D17/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
A47F1/035 (EP);
G07F11/52 (US);
B65D83/0083 (US);
G07F11/00 (US);
G07F11/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2021/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELARTIKELSPENDER | [2021/50] | English: | DETERGENT ARTICLES DISPENSER | [2021/50] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR D'ARTICLES DÉTERGENTS | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 13.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE2822581 (MUELLER S MUEHLE) [I] 1-15 * page 8, line 6 - line 7 * * page 11 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102008010421 (KESSEBOEHMER KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0053] ** figures 9-12 *; | [I]WO2011046501 (CLEANCANDY SWEDEN AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 13, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,3,4-7,13,24 * * claim 1 * |