EP3763706 - PARASITICIDAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES, METHODS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. 3239 Satellite Boulevard, Bldg. 500 Duluth, GA 30096 / US | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENG, Charles Q. 7158 Belcrest Drive Johns Creek, GA 30097 / US | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/02] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20179838.6 | 18.04.2013 | [2021/02] | Priority number, date | US201261635961P | 20.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261635961 P | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763706 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D235/10, C07D235/18, C07D235/28, A01N43/52, A61K31/4184 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
C07D235/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D235/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/277 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P33/00 (EP,KR);
A61P33/10 (EP);
A61P33/12 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D235/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D235/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D405/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D409/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | 12.06.2020 | ME | 12.06.2020 | Title | German: | PARASITIZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT BENZIMIDAZOLDERIVATEN, VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/02] | English: | PARASITICIDAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES, METHODS AND USES THEREOF | [2021/02] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PARASITICIDES COMPRENANT DES DÉRIVÉS DE BENZIMIDAZOLE, PROCÉDÉS ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉS | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/51] | 03.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13719345.4 / EP2895465 | EP18186136.0 / EP3453702 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2502116 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [A] 1-15* see the 2-trifluoromethyl-benzimidazoles of claim 1 as antihelminthics *; | [A]DE2815621 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [A] 1-15 * see the 2-methylthio-benzimidazoles of claim 1 as antihelminthics *; | [A]CH642359 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * see the 2-alkylthio-benzimidazoles of claim 1 as antihelminthics * | by applicant | US3748356 | US3818047 | GB1390336 | US3950360 | US4134973 | EP0002916 | EP0007812 | US4197307 | US4199569 | US4205077 | US4225598 | US4310519 | US4336262 | US4427663 | US4468390 | GB2140010 | EP0179022 | US4742060 | US4751225 | US4798837 | US4855317 | US4859657 | US4871719 | US4874749 | US4920148 | US4963582 | US4973711 | US4978677 | WO9109961 | US5055596 | US5077308 | WO9222555 | NZ237086 | US5399582 | EP0667054 | EP0677054 | WO9703988 | US5703078 | US5750695 | US5824653 | EP0892060 | US5962499 | US6096329 | US6221894 | WO0176370 | US6399786 | US6685954 | WO2004024704 | WO2005085216 | US2007066617 | WO2007070606 | WO2007075459 | WO2007079162 | US7396820 | WO2008122375 | US2008312272 | WO2009003075 | WO2009002809 | WO2009004432 | WO2009024541 | US2009133319 | US2009143410 | - MOTTIER et al., J. Parasitol., (20060000), vol. 92, no. 6, pages 1355 - 1360 | - MCCONVILLE, Parasitol. Res., (20070000), vol. 100, pages 365 - 377 | - BRENNAN et al., Experimental and Molecular Pathology, (20070000), vol. 82, pages 104 - 109 | - ALBERS-SCHONBERG et al., "Avermectins Structure Determination", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19810000), vol. 103, pages 4216 - 4221 | - Veterinary Parasitology, (19930700), vol. 49, no. 1, pages 5 - 15 | - DAVIES H.G. et al., "Avermectins and Milbemycins", Nat, Prod, Rep., (19860000), vol. 3, pages 87 - 121 | - MROZIK H. et al., "Synthesis of Milbemycins from Aveimectins", Tetrahedron Lett, (19830000), vol. 24, pages 5333 - 5336 | - "International Nonproprietary Names for Pharmaceutical Substances (INN", WHO Drug Information, (20030000), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 263 - 286 | - WILLSON et al., Parasitology, (20030100), vol. 126, pages 79 - 86 | - SAGER et al., Veterinary Parasitology, (20090000), vol. 159, pages 49 - 54 | - KAMINSKY et al., Nature, (20080313), vol. 452, pages 176 - 181 | - OSTLIND et al., Research in Veterinary Science, (19900000), vol. 48, pages 260 - 61 | - OSTLIND et al., Medical and Veterinary Entomology, (19970000), vol. 11, pages 407 - 408 | - Tet. Lett., (19810000), vol. 22, page 1977 | - J. Antibiotics, (19900000), vol. 43, page 1380 | - Antibiotics, (19910000), vol. 44, page 492 | - J. Chern. Soc, - Chem. Comm., (19800000), vol. 601 | US20090582486 |