EP3731169 - USER INTERFACE FOR LOYALTY ACCOUNTS AND PRIVATE LABEL ACCOUNTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN OS, Marcel c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop MS 302-2HI Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
PITSCHEL, Donald W. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
SUZUKI, Gregg c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 04 /
YANG, Lawrence Y. 816 Haight Street San Francisco, California / US | 05 /
ANTON, Peter D. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 06 /
STEELE, Glen W. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 07 /
DICKER, George R. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop MS 302-2APP Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 20180033.1 | 23.05.2016 | [2020/44] | Priority number, date | US201562230441P | 05.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562230441 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3731169 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/36, G06Q20/40 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0226 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q30/0215 (KR);
G06Q20/227 (CN);
G06Q20/20 (CN,KR);
G06Q20/322 (CN,KR);
G06Q20/3224 (CN);
G06Q20/3227 (CN);
G06Q20/325 (CN);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06Q20/36 (US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06Q20/40 (US);
G06Q20/401 (CN);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/407 (CN);
G06Q30/0207 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR LOYALITÄTSKONTEN UND PRIVATKUNDENKONTEN | [2020/44] | English: | USER INTERFACE FOR LOYALTY ACCOUNTS AND PRIVATE LABEL ACCOUNTS | [2020/44] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR COMPTES DE FIDÉLITÉ ET COMPTES D'ÉTIQUETTES PRIVÉS | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 06.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/12] | 13.02.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/12] | Appeal following examination | 25.05.2022 | Appeal received No. T2122/22 | 25.05.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 27.07.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16803996.4 / EP3304476 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008078831 (JOHNSON P MARC [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0097] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2010082445 (HODGE ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] ** paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0130] *; | [I]US2012310760 (PHILLIPS SIMON [GB], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0078] * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US6323846 | US2002015024 | US6570557 | US6677932 | US2005190059 | US2006017692 | US7657849 | US19620609365 | US20040840862 | US20040903964 | US20050038590 | US20050048264 | US20050228758 | US20050228700 | US20050228737 | US20050322549 | US20060367749 | US20060381313 | US20070968067 | US20080240788 | US20080241839 | US20090586862 | US20090638251 | WO2013US40061 | WO2013US69483 |