EP3925427 - CUTTING HEAD FOR A MOTOR STRIMMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andreas Stihl AG & Co. KG Badstrasse 115 71336 Waiblingen / DE | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RETHABER, Achim 70736 Fellbach / DE | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | Wasmuth, Rolf, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20180105.7 | 15.06.2020 | [2021/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925427 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/416, A01D34/73, A01D34/81 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
A01D34/4165 (EP);
A01D34/73 (CN);
A01D34/733 (US);
A01D34/416 (EP);
A01D34/68 (CN);
A01D34/736 (EP);
A01D34/82 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2021/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDKOPF FÜR EINE MOTORSENSE | [2021/51] | English: | CUTTING HEAD FOR A MOTOR STRIMMER | [2021/51] | French: | TÊTE DE COUPE POUR UNE DÉBROUSSAILLEUSE | [2021/51] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 14.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002073556 (FOGLE JOHN R [US]) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0056] *; | [Y]WO2008053508 (ARNETOLI FABRIZIO [IT]) [Y] 4-7 * figure 1 * * page 4 - page 9 *; | [XYI]US2008271424 (ALLISS GEORGE E [US]) [X] 1,15 * figures 12-15B * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0136] * * paragraphs [0057] , [0066] * [Y] 3-7,11,12 [I] 2,8-10,13,14; | [Y]EP2737788 (TECHTRONIC OUTDOOR PROD TECH [BM]) [Y] 1,3,11,12 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0030] *; | [Y]US2019075721 (CHOLST BETH E [US], et al) [Y] 4-7 * figure 4 ** paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0040] * |