EP3754319 - IRREVERSIBLE PRESSURE VARIATION INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphite Technology Asia Limited 10/F Guandong Investment Tower 148 Connaught Road Central Hong Kong / CN | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states Hug, Christian 399 Yue Zhou Road Apartment N°1501 Immeuble 1 Shanghai 200086 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUG, Christian 399 Yue Zhou Road Apartment N° 1501, Building 1 200086 Shanghai / CN | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/52] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [2024/13] |
Former [2020/52] | LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20180629.6 | 17.06.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | FR20190006646 | 20.06.2019 Original published format: FR 1906646 | [2020/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754319 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3754319 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/06, G01L23/32, F16K17/16, H01H35/24, F16K37/00, // H01H35/26 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G01L23/32 (EP,US);
G01L11/00 (CN,US);
G01L23/02 (US);
F16K17/1633 (EP);
F16K37/00 (EP,US);
G01L13/00 (US);
G01L19/0645 (EP,US);
G01L19/0672 (EP,US);
H01H35/24 (EP,US);
H01H35/2657 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2020/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IRREVERSIBLER ANZEIGER VON DRUCKVERÄNDERUNGEN | [2020/52] | English: | IRREVERSIBLE PRESSURE VARIATION INDICATOR | [2020/52] | French: | INDICATEUR IRREVERSIBLE DE VARIATION DE PRESSION | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 23.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | SE | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2788794 (JACQUES HOLINGER CARL) [X] 1,7,9 * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 36; figures 1,3 * [I] 2-6,8; | [XI]GB1033035 (BROWN BOVERI KRUPP REAKTOR) [X] 1,7,9 * page 2, line 100 - page 3, line 11; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 2-6,8; | [XAI]DE102011078878 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0015] , [0021] , [0024] , [0037] , [0038] , [0041] * [A] 9 [I] 3-6,8; | [XA]US2018040926 (KESER GORAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0034]; figures 3,4a,4b,9 *[A] 2-6 | by applicant | US5313194 |