EP3754679 - AN ELECTRICAL SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rabb, Patrik ABB Oy Muottitie 2 A 65320 Vaasa / FI | 02 /
Kolmonen, Rainer ABB Oy Muottitie 2 A 65230 Vaasa / FI | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 20180708.8 | 18.06.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | FI20190005552 | 20.06.2019 Original published format: FI 20195552 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754679 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3754679 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/56, H01H1/42, // H01H19/64, H01H19/46, H02J9/06 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H01H1/56 (EP,CN,FI);
H01H19/38 (FI);
H01H1/2041 (EP,US);
H01H1/06 (CN,FI,US);
H01H1/22 (CN);
H01H1/221 (CN);
H01H1/42 (EP,US);
H01H19/12 (FI);
H01H19/42 (FI);
H01H21/54 (US);
H01H3/161 (US);
H01H33/10 (US);
H01H9/02 (US);
H01H19/46 (EP);
H01H19/64 (EP);
H01H2300/018 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2020/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER SCHALTER | [2020/52] | English: | AN ELECTRICAL SWITCH | [2020/52] | French: | COMMUTATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 24.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | IE | 18.06.2023 | LU | 18.06.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 18.06.2023 | ||
LU | 18.06.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 18.06.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN107919722 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 3] , [0 32] - [0038]; figures 1, 3-5 * * paragraph [0051]; figures 6, 7 *; | [Y]EP3457422 (ABB OY [FI]) [Y] 1-11* paragraphs [0019] - [0100] - [ 121] , [ 124]; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]WO2019053333 (ABB OY [FI]) [Y] 1-4,6-11 * page 2, lines 9-15 * * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 18; figures 1-3 * |