EP3767185 - VAPOUR EXTRACTION DEVICE WITH FILTER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/03] | VAPOUR EXTRACTION DEVICE AND FILTER ELEMENT FOR VAPOUR EXTRACTION DEVICE | ||
[2023/40] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schopp, Daniel Karpfenweg 18 74374 Zaberfeld / DE | 02 /
Kateb, Adnen Nelkenstr. 7 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Driedger, Benjamin Kirchstraße 9 76356 Weingarten (Baden) / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 20180830.0 | 18.06.2020 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | DE201910210483 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019210483 | [2021/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767185 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3767185 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20, B01D46/00, B01D46/12 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
F24C15/2035 (EP);
B01D46/0005 (EP);
B01D46/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | F24C15/20, B01D46/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DUNSTABZUGSVORRICHTUNG MIT FILTERELEMENT | [2023/40] | English: | VAPOUR EXTRACTION DEVICE WITH FILTER ELEMENT | [2023/40] | French: | HOTTE ASPIRANTE AVEC ÉLÉMENT FILTRANT | [2023/40] |
Former [2021/03] | FILTERELEMENT FÜR DUNSTABZUGSVORRICHTUNG UND DUNSTABZUGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2021/03] | VAPOUR EXTRACTION DEVICE AND FILTER ELEMENT FOR VAPOUR EXTRACTION DEVICE | ||
Former [2021/03] | ÉLÉMENT FILTRANT POUR HOTTE ASPIRANTE ET HOTTE ASPIRANTE | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 20.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4689058 (VOGT CLIFFORD M [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2011047944 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,10* figure 3 *; | [XI]DE202011109799U (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0 40]; figure 4 * [I] 2-6 | Examination | EP2338004 |