EP3764555 - RANGING TECHNOLOGY USE FOR ULTRA-BROADBAND COMMUNICATION IN MILLIMETER WAVE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENTSCH, Thomas NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
AL-KADI, Ghiath NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 20181030.6 | 19.06.2020 | [2021/02] | Priority number, date | US201916449557 | 24.06.2019 Original published format: US201916449557 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764555 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/7163, G01S5/02, H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04B7/04, G01S3/02 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
H04B1/7163 (EP,CN);
H04W64/006 (CN);
G01S7/006 (US);
G01S13/765 (US);
G01S13/878 (US);
G01S3/50 (US);
G01S5/0205 (EP);
G01S5/10 (CN);
H01Q5/25 (US);
H04B1/3833 (US);
H04W76/10 (US);
G01S5/02 (EP);
H04B2201/71634 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] |
Former [2021/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER ENTFERNUNGSMESSTECHNOLOGIE ZUR ULTRABREITBANDKOMMUNIKATION IN MILLIMETERWELLEN-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2021/02] | English: | RANGING TECHNOLOGY USE FOR ULTRA-BROADBAND COMMUNICATION IN MILLIMETER WAVE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2021/02] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE TECHNOLOGIE DE TÉLÉMÉTRIE POUR LA COMMUNICATION À ULTRA-LARGE BANDE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION À ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 13.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009213901 (BERENS FRIEDBERT [CH]) [X] 1,2,5,7-11,13,15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 13] , [0 21]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0050] - [0056] - [0 72] - [0076] * [Y] 4,6,14 [I] 3,12; | [Y] - SAAD M M ET AL, "High accuracy location estimation for a Mobile Tag using one-way UWB signaling", UBIQUITOUS POSITIONING, INDOOR NAVIGATION, AND LOCATION BASED SERVICE (UPINLBS), 2012, IEEE, (20121003), doi:10.1109/UPINLBS.2012.6409769, ISBN 978-1-4673-1908-9, pages 1 - 8, XP032307943 [Y] 4,6,14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/UPINLBS.2012.6409769 |