EP3926381 - METHOD OF MOUNTING A MIRROR MOUNT FOR A HEAD-UP DISPLAY IN A HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jabil Inc. 10560 Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. St. North St. Petersburg, Florida 33716 / US | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOVACS, Ernst 2514 Traiskirchen / AT | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | Gruber, Philipp Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20181031.4 | 19.06.2020 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3926381 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3926381 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/182, G02B27/64, G02B27/01 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
G02B7/1821 (EP);
G02B27/0149 (EP);
G02B27/646 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] |
Former [2021/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER SPIEGELHALTERUNG FÜR EIN HEAD-UP-DISPLAY IN EINEM GEHÄUSE | [2021/51] | English: | METHOD OF MOUNTING A MIRROR MOUNT FOR A HEAD-UP DISPLAY IN A HOUSING | [2021/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN SUPPORT DE MIROIR POUR UN AFFICHAGE TÊTE HAUTE DANS UN BOÎTIER | [2021/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 20.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2007086226 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1834589 (SYSMEX CORP [JP]) [X] 9 * figure 3 *; | [A]KR20110073328 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2014215459 (NIPPON SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN204610953U (XIAMEN CONJOIN ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 7* figure 1 *; | [X]CN205896212U (WEIFANG LICHUANG ELECTRONIC SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [X] 9,10 * figure 2 * |