EP3754163 - INFORMATION PROVISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN 471-8571 / JP | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIYAMA, Kouseki C/O Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
YOKOYAMA, Daiki C/O Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20181159.3 | 19.06.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | JP20190115848 | 21.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019115848 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754163 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3754163 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, F01N3/00 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
F01N3/0857 (EP,CN);
G06Q30/018 (US);
B01D53/02 (CN);
B01D53/047 (US);
B60K35/00 (US);
F01N3/00 (EP);
F01N3/08 (CN);
G01C21/3469 (CN,US);
G06Q30/0215 (US);
G06Q50/40 (US);
G07C5/0825 (US);
G08B21/14 (US);
B01D2253/108 (US);
B01D2257/504 (CN,US);
B01D2259/4566 (US);
B01D2259/652 (US);
B60K2360/167 (US);
B60K2360/168 (US);
B60K2360/174 (US);
B60K35/22 (US);
B60K35/28 (US);
F01N2570/10 (EP,CN);
F01N2900/102 (EP);
G07C5/0816 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSBEREITSTELLUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/52] | English: | INFORMATION PROVISION SYSTEM | [2020/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'INFORMATIONS | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 22.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007203643 (RAMASWAMY DEEPAK [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [Y]DE102008002695 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0017]; claims 1-7 *; | [Y]JP2011185854 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-9* claim 1 *; | [XY]US2015033701 (HYDE RODERICK A [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * figure 1; claims 1-7 * [Y] 1-9; | [Y]US2015106001 (LEE BENJAMIN F [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]US2017030234 (HYDE RODERICK A [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0080]; claim 1 * [Y] 1-9 | by applicant | JP2014509360 |