EP3928934 - HAIR COLLECTOR FOR A PIVOTING CUTTING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lap, Reinder Niels 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Binnema, Barend Martinus 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20181709.5 | 23.06.2020 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928934 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/44, B26B19/20 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
B26B19/44 (EP,US);
B26B19/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAARSAMMLER FÜR EIN SCHWENKBARES SCHNEIDELEMENT | [2021/52] | English: | HAIR COLLECTOR FOR A PIVOTING CUTTING ELEMENT | [2021/52] | French: | COLLECTEUR DE CHEVEUX POUR UN ÉLÉMENT DE COUPE PIVOTANT | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/49] | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016134920 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [XA]EP3300859 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP3388206 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]EP3666478 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) |