EP3750501 - SYSTEMS FOR TISSUE ABLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stratus Medical, LLC 32303 FM-2978 Magnolia, TX 77354 / US | [2024/10] |
Former [2020/51] | For all designated states Stratus Medical, LLC 6030 W. Harold Gatty Drive Salt Lake City, UT 84116 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Robert, E. 158 Church Street Brighton Victoria 3186 / AU | 02 /
BRANDT, Scott, A. 512 Cook St Denver, CO 80206 / US | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/51] | 01 /
WRIGHT, Robert, E. 925 Lincoln Ph Denver, CO 80203 / US | ||
02 /
BRANDT, Scott, A. 333 South Monroe Street 113 Denver, CO 80209 / US | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [2024/10] |
Former [2020/51] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 20181799.6 | 04.05.2011 | [2020/51] | Priority number, date | US201034735110P | 21.05.2010 Original published format: US 34735110 P | US201035789410P | 23.06.2010 Original published format: US 35789410 P | US201035788610P | 23.06.2010 Original published format: US 35788610 P | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750501 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3750501 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
A61B18/1477 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/1206 (KR,US);
A61B2018/0044 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00577 (KR,US);
A61B2018/1253 (KR,US);
A61B2018/1427 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] |
Former [2020/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR GEWEBEABLATION | [2020/51] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR TISSUE ABLATION | [2020/51] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ABLATION DE TISSUS | [2020/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 15.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11783944.9 / EP2571439 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9706739 (ZOMED INT INC [US], et al); | [A]US5728143 (GOUGH EDWARD J [US], et al); | [A]US2002143302 (HINCHLIFFE PETER W J [US], et al); | [A]US2004059328 (DANIEL STEVEN A [US], et al); | [A]US2006189972 (GROSSMAN JESSICA [US]); | [A]US2007006215 (EPSTEIN GORDON [US], et al); | [A]US2007203486 (YOUNG KIMBOLT [US]) |