EP3766661 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A MELT AND / OR PLASTIC FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brückner Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG Königsberger Strasse 5-7 83313 Siegsdorf / DE | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoche, Thomas Bachmayerstraße 14 83278 Traunstein / DE | 02 /
Armbruster, Maximilian Holzhofweg 6c 83512 Wasserburg a. Inn / DE | 03 /
Hoffmann, Andreas Haidenholzstraße 65 83071 Stephanskirchen / DE | 04 /
Frass, Sebastian Kastanienweg 13 83071 Stephanskirchen / DE | 05 /
Krippner, Heiko Breslauer Ring 16 83278 Traunstein / DE | 06 /
Kuhnigk, Steffen Reichenhallerstraße 2 83334 Inzell / DE | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Flach Bauer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Adlzreiterstraße 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | Flach Bauer Stahl Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Adlzreiterstraße 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 20181906.7 | 24.06.2020 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | DE201910119505 | 18.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019119505 | [2021/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3766661 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3766661 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/27, B29C48/14, B29C48/08, B29C48/88, B29C48/92 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
B29C48/914 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C48/1472 (EP,US);
B29C48/1476 (US);
B29C48/25 (KR);
B29C48/27 (KR);
B29C48/274 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP);
B29C55/04 (KR);
B29C55/12 (KR,US);
C08J5/18 (CN);
B29C2948/92723 (EP);
B29C2948/92923 (EP);
B29C48/95 (EP);
B29L2007/008 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHMELZE- UND/ODER KUNSTSTOFFFILMS | [2021/03] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A MELT AND / OR PLASTIC FILM | [2021/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN FEUILLE DE FUSION ET/OU DE MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | [2021/03] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2020 | AL | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | DK | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | ES | 10.11.2021 | FI | 10.11.2021 | HR | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | MK | 10.11.2021 | MT | 10.11.2021 | NL | 10.11.2021 | PL | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | RS | 10.11.2021 | SE | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | BG | 10.02.2022 | NO | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | PT | 10.03.2022 | IE | 24.06.2022 | LU | 24.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/26] | HU | 24.06.2020 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 10.11.2021 | |
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 10.11.2021 | |
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 10.11.2021 | |
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 10.11.2021 | |
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | FI | 10.11.2021 | |
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 10.11.2021 | |
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 10.11.2021 | |
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3423493 (KLENK LUDWIG, et al) [A] 1-17 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0224432 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-17 * claims 1,2,5,7,18,24 ** figure 1 *; | [XAI]WO2009044906 (TONEN SEKIYUKAGAKU KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * figure 1 * [A] 2,9 [I] 3-7,10-17; | [XA]DE102011013539 (BERLING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,15-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] * * figure 1 * [A] 2-7,9-14; | [A]EP3124201 (TORAY BATTERY SEPARATOR FILM [JP]) [A] 1-17 * figures 1,4 * | by applicant | EP0160551 | EP0378279 | WO9965093 | WO2008016174 | WO2012138398 | US2018036930 |