EP3757598 - IN DEVICE INTERFERENCE MITIGATION USING SENSOR FUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTRA, Avik Werinherstr. 15 81541 München / DE | 02 /
BAL, Jagjit Singh 37200 Paseo Padre Parkway, Apt. 141 Fremont 94356 / US | [2024/16] |
Former [2021/01] | 01 /
SANTRA, Avik Werinherstr. 15 81541 München / DE | ||
02 /
BAL, Jagjit Singh 37200 Paseo Padre Parkway, Apt. 141 Fremont, 94356 / US | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [2024/34] |
Former [2021/01] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20181924.0 | 24.06.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201916452028 | 25.06.2019 Original published format: US201916452028 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757598 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3757598 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/02, G01S7/292, G01S7/52, G01S13/86 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G01S7/023 (EP,US);
G01S13/58 (CN);
G01S13/50 (US);
G01S13/581 (CN);
G01S13/583 (CN);
G01S13/86 (EP);
G01S7/021 (CN);
G01S7/282 (US);
G01S7/285 (CN,US);
G01S7/2928 (EP);
G01S7/352 (CN);
G01S7/411 (CN);
G01S15/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABSCHWÄCHUNG VON INTERFERENZEN IN EINER VORRICHTUNG MITTELS SENSORFUSION | [2021/01] | English: | IN DEVICE INTERFERENCE MITIGATION USING SENSOR FUSION | [2021/01] | French: | RÉDUCTION D'INTERFÉRENCE INTRA-DISPOSITIF AU MOYEN D'UNE FUSION DE CAPTEURS | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 09.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013037399 (FICOMIRRORS S A [ES], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XAI]WO2018129294 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8,15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0041]; figures 1-4 * [A] 6 [I] 5,9-14; | [A]DE102017205331 (GRIESHABER VEGA KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |