EP3772059 - DECODING METHOD AND APPARATUS IN ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORK FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Min-Joong 130 Samsung-ro, Youngtong-gu, Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kang, Tae Gyoon 130 Samsung-ro, Youngtong-gu, Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2021/05] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/05] | Application number, filing date | 20181967.9 | 24.06.2020 | [2021/05] | Priority number, date | KR20190093066 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190093066 | [2021/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3772059 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3772059 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/16, G06N3/04, G10L15/183 | [2021/05] | CPC: |
G10L15/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06N3/08 (EP,KR);
G06N3/045 (EP,KR);
G06N3/065 (KR);
G10L15/02 (CN,KR);
G10L15/063 (CN);
G10L15/183 (EP);
G10L15/26 (KR);
G10L19/00 (KR);
G06N3/044 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] |
Former [2021/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG IN KÜNSTLICHEM NEURONALEM NETZ ZUR SPRACHERKENNUNG | [2021/05] | English: | DECODING METHOD AND APPARATUS IN ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORK FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION | [2021/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE DANS UN RÉSEAU NEURONAL ARTIFICIEL POUR LA RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE | [2021/05] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 03.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.11.2023 | 01.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 |