EP3756722 - BALLOON ANCHORING GUIDE CATHETER EXTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORBUSNEICH MEDICAL PTE. LTD 114 Lavender street CT HUB 2 10-70 & 10-71 338729 Singapore / SG | [2022/12] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states ORBUSNEICH MEDICAL PTE. LTD 79 Anson Road 07-03 079906 Singapore / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTTONE JR., Robert John 13040 SW 30th Court DAVIE, FL 33330 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt LIOC Patents & Trademarks Zwaanstraat 31 L 5651 CA Eindhoven / NL | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20182056.0 | 24.06.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201962865498P | 24.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962865498 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3756722 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06, A61M25/10, // A61M25/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61M25/0662 (EP);
A61M25/04 (US);
A61M25/0113 (US);
A61M25/1011 (EP);
A61M2025/0018 (EP);
A61M2025/0079 (EP);
A61M2205/0266 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BALLONVERANKERUNGSFÜHRUNGSKATHETERVERLÄNGERUNG | [2021/01] | English: | BALLOON ANCHORING GUIDE CATHETER EXTENSION | [2021/01] | French: | EXTENSION DE CATHÉTER À GUIDAGE D'ANCRAGE À BALLONNET | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5792118 (KURTH PAUL A [US], et al); | [A]US2014249508 (WANG HUISUN [US], et al); | [A]WO2017019900 (ANDREW HO M D INC [US]); | [XAI]US2017252043 (FULLER JEFFREY STEVEN [US], et al); | [XA]EP3498329 (NIPRO CORP [JP]) | by applicant | US19820627292 |