EP3767149 - PIPE REPAIR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sundrla, Thad Paul 14067 County Road 43 P.O. Box 411 Drake, CO 80515 / US | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2021/03] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 20182080.0 | 24.06.2020 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | US201916457218 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: US201916457218 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767149 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3767149 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/105, F16L55/16, F16L55/17, F16L55/179, B29C45/00, F16K3/02, F16K27/04 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
F16L55/105 (EP);
F16K27/044 (EP);
F16K3/0281 (EP);
F16L55/1608 (EP);
F16L55/1715 (EP);
F16L55/179 (EP);
F16L3/1075 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | F16L55/105, F16L55/16, F16L55/17, F16L55/179, B29C45/00, F16K3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROHRREPARATURVORRICHTUNG | [2021/03] | English: | PIPE REPAIR DEVICE | [2021/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉPARATION DE TUYAU | [2021/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 20.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 24.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IE | 24.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002070316 (HOWE SAMUEL H [US]) [A] 10 * figures 1-5 * * claim 17 *; | [XI]GB2464489 (SHEARD JULIAN [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,12-14 * figures 1-3 * [I] 8,9,11; | [XI]GB2483943 (DOYLE TIMOTHY CHARLES [GB]) [X] 1-10,12-14 * the whole document * [I] 11; | [A]EP2442001 (JH1010 APS [DK]) [A] 1,14* the whole document *; | [X]GB2505528 (BEECH DAVID [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,7-14 * figures 1-3, 18-19 * * page 11, line 345 - line 360 * |