EP3928730 - DEVICES FOR TREATING SKIN TISSUE USING COLD PLASMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inbar Medical Ltd. 3 Bialo pole Street office 8, 3rd floor 1618 Sofia / BG | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZOULAY, Moshe 1923000 Kibbutz Megido / IL | 02 /
FUCHS, Eliezer 1923000 Kibbutz Megido / IL | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Birgitta, et al REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys Donau-City-Straße 11 1220 Wien / AT | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20182205.3 | 25.06.2020 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928730 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/04, A61B18/00 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61B18/042 (EP,IL,US);
A45D29/00 (IL,US);
A45D44/00 (IL,US);
A61N1/44 (US);
A45D2200/20 (IL,US);
A61B2017/00172 (IL,US);
A61B2017/0046 (IL,US);
A61B2018/0047 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00583 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/0072 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00726 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00732 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00761 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00767 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTGEWEBE MIT KALTEM PLASMA | [2021/52] | English: | DEVICES FOR TREATING SKIN TISSUE USING COLD PLASMA | [2021/52] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE TRAITEMENT DE TISSU CUTANÉ À L'AIDE DE PLASMA FROID | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 13.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6518538 (BERNABEI GIAN FRANCO [IT]); | [A]WO2011061476 (LINDE AG [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2014181279 (OTECH INDUSTRY S R L [IT]); | [Y]US2016193475 (SRB JOSEF [CZ], et al); | [XYI]WO2019147568 (APYX MEDICAL CORP [US]) | by applicant | US9993282 | US10213614 |