EP3757649 - XYZ MICROSCOPE STAGE WITH A VERTICALLY TRANSLATABLE CARRIAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYBERTRON Gesellschaft für Kinematische Systeme und Laborautomation mbH Holzhauser Str. 153 Aufgang C.22 13509 Berlin / DE | [2023/44] |
Former [2023/41] | For all designated states Medipan GmbH Ludwig-Erhard-Ring 3 15827 Dahlewitz / DE | ||
For all designated states CYBERTRON Gesellschaft für Kinematische Systeme und Laborautomation mbH Holzhauser Str. 153 Aufgang C.22 13509 Berlin / DE | |||
Former [2022/49] | For all designated states Medipan GmbH Ludwig-Erhard-Ring 3 15827 Dahlewitz / DE | ||
For all designated states Cybertron GmbH Holzhauser Str. 153 Aufgang C.22 13509 Berlin / DE | |||
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Medipan GmbH Ludwig-Erhard-Ring 3 15827 Dahlewitz / DE | ||
For all designated states Cybertron GmbH Am Borsigturm 100 13507 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roggenbuck, Dirk Fontanestr. 5 15344 Strausberg / DE | 02 /
Arndt, Matthias - deceased / DE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20182523.9 | 26.06.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | EP20190182835 | 27.06.2019 Original published format: EP 19182835 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3757649 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3757649 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3757649 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3757649 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G02B21/16 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G02B21/0088 (EP);
G02B21/26 (CN,US);
G02B21/241 (US);
G02B21/16 (EP);
G02B21/244 (CN);
G01N21/6486 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | XYZ-MIKROSKOPTISCH MIT EINEM VERTIKAL VERSCHIEBBAREN SCHLITTEN | [2021/01] | English: | XYZ MICROSCOPE STAGE WITH A VERTICALLY TRANSLATABLE CARRIAGE | [2021/01] | French: | PLATINE XYZ DE MICROSCOPE DOTÉE D'UN CHARIOT À TRANSLATION VERTICALE | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 10.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.08.2023 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.05.2024
03.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE EUROIMMUN Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG Seekamp 31 23560 Lübeck / DE Opponent's representative Mildner, Volker, et al, et al c/o EUROIMMUN Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG Seekamp 31 23560 Lübeck / DE | [2024/24] | 17.05.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.09.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4902101 (FUJIHARA TADAFUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12* column 1, line 56 - line 61; claim 1 *; | [YD]JPH03100446 (HITACHI ELECTR ENG) [YD] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH03100446 | DE4338155 | DE19801400 | DE10017041 | WO2009062497 | WO2011101487 | WO2012168184 | CN203479812U | Opposition | US4902101 | JPH03100446 | WO9637346 | US5684628 | DE10017041 | US2005099680 | US6898007 | US2005225852 | WO2007088369 | WO2009062497 | WO2012168184 | CN202649589U | CN202975467U | CN203479812U | CN108938321 | EP2609460 |