EP3751250 - SAMPLING PORTS AND RELATED CONTAINER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodwin, Michael E. 1355 Red Rox Trace Logan, UT Utah 84321 / US | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/42] | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil, et al Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2020/51] | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor, Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 20183001.5 | 20.03.2007 | [2020/51] | Priority number, date | US20060385626 | 20.03.2006 Original published format: US 385626 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3751250 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3751250 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/10 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
G01N1/10 (EP,US);
G01K1/14 (US);
C12M1/26 (US);
C12M1/28 (US);
C12M23/14 (EP,US);
C12M23/26 (EP,US);
C12M23/46 (EP,US);
C12M27/02 (EP,US);
C12M29/06 (EP,US);
C12M33/00 (EP,US);
C12M41/12 (EP,US);
B01F2101/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/29] |
Former [2020/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PROBENAHMEPORTS UND ENTSPRECHENDE BEHÄLTERSYSTEME | [2020/51] | English: | SAMPLING PORTS AND RELATED CONTAINER SYSTEMS | [2020/51] | French: | TROUS DE PRÉLÈVEMENT ET SYSTÈMES DE CONTENANT ASSOCIÉ | [2020/51] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 11.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07251179.3 / EP1837640 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | IT | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | NL | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | SE | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | IE | 20.03.2023 | LU | 20.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 19.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3085435 (MISCOE ANTHONY J, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4294124 (KALWAITIS GEORGE V) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4413533 (DIESEL HANS A [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5085087 (FRANCK GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2003115973 (SEATTER NORMAN EUGENE [CA]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAI]EP1548420 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,11,13,15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0045]; figure 2 * [A] 4,5,12 [I] 3,7,10,14 | by applicant | US6083587 | US2002131654 | US2003077466 | US2005239199 | US20060112834 | US20050127651 |