EP3760533 - OUTBOARD MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEGAYA, Yuki c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
OGUMA, Takahiro c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 03 /
HAMADA, Satoru c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 04 /
ONOUE, Akihiro c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20183578.2 | 02.07.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | JP20190126056 | 05.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019126056 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760533 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3760533 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B63H20/28, B63H20/20 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
B63H20/28 (EP,US);
B63H20/20 (EP,US);
B63H23/34 (US);
B63H2020/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSSENBORDMOTOR | [2021/01] | English: | OUTBOARD MOTOR | [2021/01] | French: | MOTEUR HORS-BORD | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 28.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21183062.5 / EP3909841 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2020 | AL | 02.03.2022 | AT | 02.03.2022 | CY | 02.03.2022 | CZ | 02.03.2022 | DK | 02.03.2022 | EE | 02.03.2022 | ES | 02.03.2022 | FI | 02.03.2022 | HR | 02.03.2022 | LT | 02.03.2022 | LV | 02.03.2022 | MC | 02.03.2022 | MK | 02.03.2022 | NL | 02.03.2022 | PL | 02.03.2022 | RO | 02.03.2022 | RS | 02.03.2022 | SE | 02.03.2022 | SI | 02.03.2022 | SK | 02.03.2022 | SM | 02.03.2022 | BG | 02.06.2022 | NO | 02.06.2022 | GR | 03.06.2022 | IE | 02.07.2022 | IS | 02.07.2022 | LU | 02.07.2022 | PT | 04.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
MK | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IE | 02.07.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
LU | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IE | 02.07.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
LU | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IE | 02.07.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
LU | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
LU | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
LU | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.03.2022 | |
NO | 02.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2007008329 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-3, 6, 8 * [A] 6,7,9-13,18 [I] 5,8,14-17; | [XA]US2016185432 (ACHIWA TETSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 14,16,17,19 * figures 1-8 *[A] 1-13,15,18 | by applicant | JP2011245936 |