EP3932937 - NOVEL PROTEIN TRANSLOCATION DOMAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitätsklinikum Hamburg-Eppendorf Martinistrasse 52 20246 Hamburg / DE | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARLOVITS, Thomas 1170 Wien / AT | 02 /
GÖSSWEINER-MOHR, Nikolaus 4203 Altenberg bei Linz / AT | 03 /
CHABLOZ, Antoine 1053 Cugy / CH | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20184100.4 | 03.07.2020 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3932937 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/255, C07K14/82, C12N9/16 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
C12N9/16 (EP);
C07K14/255 (EP);
C07K14/82 (EP);
C12Y301/03048 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] |
Former [2022/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE PROTEINTRANSLOKATIONSDOMÄNE | [2022/01] | English: | NOVEL PROTEIN TRANSLOCATION DOMAIN | [2022/01] | French: | NOUVEAU DOMAINE DE TRANSLOCATION DE PROTÉINES | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 05.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008019183 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-12,14 * paragraphs [0041] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0156] - [0159] * * paragraph [0195] * * figures 17, 18 * [I] 4,13,15; | [X]WO2015078840 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 53] - [0055] - [0 81] , [ 107] , [ 115] - [0116] * * example 1 * * figure 1 *; | [XI] - YUKIHIRO AKEDA ET AL, "Chaperone release and unfolding of substrates in type III secretion", NATURE, (20051006), vol. 437, no. 7060, doi:10.1038/nature03992, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 911 - 915, XP055102176 [X] 1-3,5-12,14 * abstract * * page 911, column r, paragraph l * * figures 1, 2, 4 * [I] 4,13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03992 | [A] - C. EREC STEBBINS ET AL, "Maintenance of an unfolded polypeptide by a cognate chaperone in bacterial type III secretion", NATURE, (20011101), vol. 414, doi:10.1038/35102073, pages 77 - 81, XP055759662 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35102073 | by applicant | - VIVES, E.BRODIN, P.LEBLEU, B., "A truncated HIV-1 Tat protein basic domain rapidly translocates through the plasma membrane and accumulates in the cell nucleus", J. Biol. Chem., (19970000), vol. 272, doi:10.1074/jbc.272.25.16010, pages 16010 - 7, XP002940007 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.25.16010 | - DEROSSI, D.JOLIOT, A. H.CHASSAING, G.PROCHIANTZ, A., "The Third Helix of the Antennapedia Homeodornain Translocates through Biological Membranes", J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 296, pages 10444 - 10450 | - DEPREY, K.BECKER, L.KRITZER, J.PLUCKTHUN, A., "Trapped! A Critical Evaluation of Methods for Measuring Total Cellular Uptake versus Cytosolic Localization", Bioconjug. Chem., (20190000), vol. 30, pages 1006 - 1027 | - KAMALY, N.XIAO, Z.VALENCIA, P. M.RADOVIC-MORENO, A. F.FAROKHZAD, O. C., "Targeted polymeric therapeutic nanoparticles: design, development and clinical translation", Chem. Soc. Rev., (20120000), vol. 41, pages 2971 - 3010 | - RABIDEAU, A. E.PENTELUTE, B. L., "Delivery of Non-Native Cargo into Mammalian Cells Using Anthrax Lethal Toxin", ACS Chem. Biol., (20160000), vol. 11, doi:10.1021/acschembio.6b00169, pages 1490 - 1501, XP055635299 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acschembio.6b00169 | - BEILHARTZ, G. L.SUGIMAN-MARANGOS, S. N.MELNYK, R. A., "Repurposing bacterial toxins for intracellular delivery of therapeutic proteins", Biochem. Pharmacol., (20170000), vol. 142, pages 13 - 20 | - VERDURMEN, W. P. R.MAZLAMI, M.PLUCKTHUN, A., "A quantitative comparison of cytosolic delivery via different protein uptake systems", Sci. Rep., (20170000), vol. 7, pages 1 - 13 | - GALAN, J. E.WAKSMAN, G., "Protein-Injection Machines in Bacteria", Cell, (20180000), vol. 172, pages 1306 - 1318 | - GALAN, J. E.LARA-TEJERO, M.MARLOVITS, T. C.WAGNER, S., "Bacterial type III secretion systems: specialized nanomachines for protein delivery into target cells", Annu. Rev. Microbiol., (20140000), vol. 68, pages 415 - 38 | - PLUCKTHUN, A., "Designed Ankyrin Repeat Proteins (DARPins): Binding Proteins for Research, Diagnostics, and Therapy", Annu. Rev. Pharmacol. Toxicol., (20150000), vol. 55, doi:10.1146/annurev-pharmtox-010611-134654, pages 489 - 511, XP055217451 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-pharmtox-010611-134654 | - MUYLDERMANS, S., "Nanobodies: natural single-domain antibodies", Annu. Rev. Biochem., (20130000), vol. 82, doi:10.1146/annurev-biochem-063011-092449, pages 775 - 97, XP055083831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-biochem-063011-092449 | - SHA, F.SALZMAN, G.GUPTA, A.KOIDE, S., "Monobodies and other synthetic binding proteins for expanding protein science", Protein Sci., (20170000), vol. 26, pages 910 - 924 | - HERCE, H. D. et al., "Cell-permeable nanobodies for targeted immunolabelling and antigen manipulation in living cells", Nat. Chem., (20170000), pages 1 - 10 | - TABTIMMAI, L., "Cell-penetrable nanobodies (transbodies) that inhibit the tyrosine kinase activity of EGFR leading to the impediment of human lung adenocarcinoma cell motility and survival", J. Cell. Biochem., (20190000), pages 1 - 11 | - RODER, R. et al., "Intracellular Delivery of Nanobodies for Imaging of Target Proteins in Live Cells", Pharm. Res., (20170000), vol. 34, doi:10.1007/s11095-016-2052-8, pages 161 - 174, XP036119684 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-016-2052-8 | - LIAO, X.RABIDEAU, A. E.PENTELUTE, B. L., "Delivery of Antibody Mimics into Mammalian Cells via Anthrax Toxin Protective Antigen", Chembiochem, (20140000), pages 2458 - 2466 | - SCHMIT, N. E.NEOPANE, K.HANTSCHEL, O., "Targeted Protein Degradation through Cytosolic Delivery of Monobody Binders Using Bacterial Toxins", ACS Chem. Biol., (20190000), vol. 14, pages 916 - 924 | - VERDURMEN, W. P. R.LUGINBUHL, M.HONEGGER, A.PLUCKTHUN, A., "Efficient cell-specific uptake of binding proteins into the cytoplasm through engineered modular transport systems", J. Control. Release, (20150000), vol. 200, doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2014.12.019, pages 13 - 22, XP029222002 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2014.12.019 | - ITTIG, S. J. et al., "A bacterial type III secretion-based protein delivery tool for broad applications in cell biology", J. Cell Biol., (20150000), vol. 211, doi:10.1083/jcb.201502074, pages 913 - 931, XP055356396 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.201502074 | - BLANCO-TORIBIO, A.MUYLDERMANS, S.FRANKEL, G.FERNANDEZ, L. Á., "Direct injection of functional single-domain antibodies from E. coli into human cells", PLoS One, (20100000), vol. 5, page e15227 | - BAI, F.LI, Z.UMEZAWA, A.TERADA, N.JIN, S., "Bacterial type III secretion system as a protein delivery tool for a broad range of biomedical applications", Biotechnol. Adv., (20180000), vol. 36, pages 482 - 493 | - JIN, Y., "Enhanced differentiation of human pluripotent stem cells into cardiomyocytes by bacteria-mediated transcription factors delivery", PLoS One, (20180000), vol. 13, pages 1 - 14 | - JIA, J. et al., "Efficient Gene Editing in Pluripotent Stem Cells by Bacterial Injection of Transcription Activator-Like Effector Nuclease Proteins", Stem Cells Transl. Med., (20150000), vol. 4, pages 913 - 26 | - GUILLARD, S., "Structural and functional characterization of a DARPin which inhibits Ras nucleotide exchange", Nat. Commun., (20170000), vol. 8, page 16111 | - SPENCER-SMITH, R., "Inhibition of RAS function through targeting an allosteric regulatory site", Nat. Chem. Biol., (20170000), vol. 13, pages 62 - 68 | - TANAKA, T.WILLIAMS, R. L.RABBITTS, T. H., "Tumour prevention by a single antibody domain targeting the interaction of signal transduction proteins with RAS", EMBO J., (20070000), vol. 26, doi:10.1038/sj.emboj.7601744, pages 3250 - 9, XP055630269 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.emboj.7601744 | - BERY, N. et al., "KRAS-specific inhibition using a DARPin binding to a site in the allosteric lobe", Nat. Commun., (20190000), vol. 10, pages 0 - 10 | - TAMASKOVIC, R. et al., "Intermolecular biparatopic trapping of ErbB2 prevents compensatory activation of PI3K/AKT via RAS-p110 crosstalk", Nat. Commun., (20160000), vol. 7, page 11672 | - KUMMER, L., "Knowledge-based design of a biosensor to quantify localized ERK activation in living cells", Chem. Biol., (20130000), vol. 20, pages 847 - 856 | - WIDMAIER, D. M. et al., "Engineering the Salmonella type III secretion system to export spider silk monomers", Mol. Syst. Biol., (20090000), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/msb.2009.62, page 309, XP055303711 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/msb.2009.62 | - STEBBINS, C. E.GALAN, J. E., "Maintenance of an unfolded polypeptide by a cognate chaperone in bacterial type III secretion", Nature, (20010000), vol. 414, pages 77 - 81 | - LEE, S. H.GALAN, J. E., "Salmonella type III secretion-associated chaperones confer secretion-pathway specificity", Mol. Microbiol., (20040000), vol. 51, pages 483 - 95 | - SPANO, S.GAO, X.HANNEMANN, S.LARA-TEJERO, M.GALAN, J. E., "A Bacterial Pathogen Targets a Host Rab-Family GTPase Defense Pathway with a GAP", Cell Host Microbe, (20160000), vol. 19, doi:10.1016/j.chom.2016.01.004, pages 216 - 226, XP029415512 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chom.2016.01.004 | - FABREGA, A.VILA, J., "Salmonella enterica serovar Typhimurium skills to succeed in the host: Virulence and regulation", Clin. Microbiol. Rev., (20130000), vol. 26, pages 308 - 341 | - BRAUCHLE, M. et al., "Protein interference applications in cellular and developmental biology using DARPins that recognize GFP and mCherry", Biol. Open, (20140000), vol. 3, pages 1252 - 1261 | - KOHL, A., "Designed to be stable: Crystal structure of a consensus ankyrin repeat protein", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20030000), vol. 100, doi:10.1073/pnas.0337680100, pages 1700 - 1705, XP055278525 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0337680100 | - BAJAJ, V.LUCAS, R. L.HWANG, C.LEE, C. A., "Co-ordinate regulation of Salmonella typhimurium invasion genes by environmental and regulatory factors is mediated by control of hilA expression", Mol. Microbiol., (19960000), vol. 22, pages 703 - 714 | - BAJAJ, V.HWANG, C.LEE, C. A., "hilA is a novel ompR/toxR family member that activates the expression of Salmonella typhimurium invasion genes", Mol. Microbiol., (19950000), vol. 18, pages 715 - 727 | - EICHELBERG, K.GALAN, J. E., "Differential regulation of Salmonella typhimurium type III secreted proteins by pathogenicity island 1 (SPI-1)-encoded transcriptional activators InvF and hilA", Infect. Immun., (19990000), vol. 67, pages 4099 - 105 | - RADICS, J.KONIGSMAIER, L.MARLOVITS, T. C., "Structure of a pathogenic type 3 secretion system in action", Nat. Struct. Mol. Biol., (20140000), vol. 21, pages 82 - 7 | - WETZEL, S. K.SETTANNI, G.KENIG, M.BINZ, H. K.PLUCKTHUN, A., "Folding and Unfolding Mechanism of Highly Stable Full-Consensus Ankyrin Repeat Proteins", J. Mol. Biol., (20080000), vol. 376, doi:10.1016/j.jmb.2007.11.046, pages 241 - 257, XP022420856 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2007.11.046 | - TEICHER, B. A. et al., "The Proteasome Inhibitor PS-341 in Cancer Therapy The Proteasome Inhibitor PS-341", Cancer Therapy, (19990000), vol. 5, pages 2638 - 2645, XP002238572 | - PRIOR, I. ALEWIS, P. D.MATTOS, C., "A comprehensive survey of Ras mutations in cancer", Cancer Res., (20120000), vol. 72, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-2612, pages 2457 - 67, XP055117242 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-2612 | - SIMANSHU, D. K.NISSLEY, D. V.MCCORMICK, F., "RAS Proteins and Their Regulators in Human Disease", Cell, (20170000), vol. 170, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2017.06.009, pages 17 - 33, XP085117958 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2017.06.009 | - MCCORMICK, F., "Progress in targeting RAS with small molecule drugs", Biochem. J., (20190000), vol. 476, pages 365 - 374 | - SCHROY, P. C. et al., "Detection of p21ras mutations in colorectal adenomas and carcinomas by enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay", Cancer, (19950000), vol. 76, pages 201 - 9 | - SCHILLING, J.SCHOPPE, J.PLUCKTHUN, A., "From DARPins to LoopDARPins: Novel LoopDARPin design allows the selection of low picomolar binders in a single round of ribosome display", J. Mol. Biol., (20140000), vol. 426, doi:10.1016/j.jmb.2013.10.026, pages 691 - 721, XP055689492 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2013.10.026 | - NIEMANN, G. S., "Discovery of novel secreted virulence factors from salmonella enterica serovar typhimurium by proteomic analysis of culture supernatants", Infect. Immun., (20110000), vol. 79, doi:10.1128/IAI.00771-10, pages 33 - 43, XP055344097 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.00771-10 | - KUBORI, T.GALAN, J. E., "Temporal regulation of Salmonella virulence effector function by proteasome-dependent protein degradation", Cell, (20030000), vol. 115, pages 333 - 42 | - SCHRAIDT, O.MARLOVITS, T. C., "Three-dimensional model of Salmonella's needle complex at subnanometer resolution", Science, (20110000), vol. 331, pages 1192 - 5 | - BUTTON, J. E.GALAN, J. E., "Regulation of chaperone/effector complex synthesis in a bacterial type III secretion system", Mol. Microbiol., (20110000), vol. 81, pages 1474 - 1483 | - HOISETH, S. K.STOCKER, B. A., "Aromatic-dependent Salmonella typhimurium are non-virulent and effective as live vaccines", Nature, (19810000), vol. 291, doi:10.1038/291238a0, pages 238 - 9, XP000882816 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/291238a0 | - KENAN C MURPHYKENNETH G CAMPELLONE, "Lambda Red-mediated recombinogenic engineering of\nenterohemorrhagic and enteropathogenic E. coli", Biomed Cent. Mol. Biol., (20030000), vol. 4, page 12 | - DATSENKO, K. AWANNER, B. L., "One-step inactivation of chromosomal genes in Escherichia coli K-12 using PCR products", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20000000), vol. 97, doi:10.1073/pnas.120163297, pages 6640 - 6645, XP002210218 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.120163297 | - KANIGA, K.BOSSIO, J. C.GALAN, J. E., "The Salmonella typhimurium invasion genes invF and invG encode homologues of the AraC and PulD family of proteins", Mol. Microbiol., (19940000), vol. 13, pages 555 - 568 | - CHEREPANOV, P. P.WACKERNAGEL, W., "Gene disruption in Escherichia coli: TcR and KmR cassettes with the option of Flp-catalyzed excision of the antibiotic-resistance determinant", Gene, (19950000), vol. 158, pages 9 - 14 | - ALIX, E.MUKHERJEE, S.ROY, C. R., "Subversion of membrane transport pathways by vacuolar pathogens", J. Cell Biol., (20110000), vol. 195, pages 943 - 952 | - STEIGEMANN, P., "Aurora B-Mediated Abscission Checkpoint Protects against Tetraploidization", Cell, (20090000), vol. 136, pages 473 - 484 |