EP3771019 - ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imre, Arpad Salzaeckerstr. 32/2 71665 Vaihingen / DE | 02 /
Schoenfelder, Herbert Franz-Marc-Weg 16 71679 Asperg / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 20184236.6 | 06.07.2020 | [2021/04] | Priority number, date | DE201910210793 | 22.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019210793 | [2021/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3771019 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/42, H01M10/48, H02J7/00, B60L58/18, H02J1/08, B60L1/00, B60L3/00, B60L58/20, B60L58/24, H02J9/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H01M10/425 (EP);
H02J7/007182 (US);
B60L1/00 (EP);
B60L3/0046 (EP);
B60L58/20 (EP);
B60L58/24 (EP);
H01M10/482 (EP);
H01M10/486 (EP);
H02J1/084 (EP,US);
H02J7/0013 (US);
H02J7/0031 (US);
H02J7/0047 (US);
H02J7/0063 (EP,US);
H02J7/007194 (US);
H01M2010/4271 (EP);
H02J2207/20 (US);
H02J2310/48 (EP);
H02J9/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | H01M10/42, H01M10/48, H02J7/00, B60L58/18, H02J1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] |
Former [2021/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES ENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETREIBEN | [2021/04] | English: | ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF | [2021/04] | French: | SYSTÈME ÉLECTRIQUE D'ACCUMULATION D'ÉNERGIE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2021/04] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102012003309 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0014] - [0020]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102014006746 (TECH UNIVERSITÄT BRAUNSCHWEIG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0020] - [0028]; figure 1 *; | [XI]DE102015106773 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1,5-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0052] , [ 101] - [0103] - [0134] , [ 135] , [0138]; figures 8,9,25 * [I] 2-4 | by applicant | DE102013204238 | KR101571110B |