EP3742856 - TECHNIQUES FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAJAPEYAM, Madhavan Srinivasan QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
DAMNJANOVIC, Aleksandar QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LUO, Tao QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Wanshi QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
GAAL, Peter QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 20184693.8 | 13.05.2016 | [2020/48] | Priority number, date | US201562161839P | 14.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562161839 P | US201615153656 | 12.05.2016 Original published format: US201615153656 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3742856 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3742856 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04W74/00, H04W16/14 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/1268 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR,US);
H04L1/1861 (US);
H04W74/004 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/04 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2020/48] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION MANAGEMENT | [2020/48] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE GESTION DE TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2020/48] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 30.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16725991.0 / EP3295750 | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - ERICSSON, "Overview of UL HARQ in LAA", vol. RAN WG2, no. Bratislava, Slovakia; 20150420 - 20150424, (20150410), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-151504 - OVERVIEW OF UL HARQ IN LAA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_89bis/Docs/, (20150410), XP050953127 [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,12-14 * paragraph [03.2] - paragraph [03.3]; figure 4 * [I] 3,7,11,15 | [XA] - ETRI, "Discussion on UL HARQ operation for LAA", vol. RAN WG1, no. Belgrade, Serbia; 20150420 - 20150424, (20150410), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-152097-DISCUSSION ON UL HARQ OPERATION FOR LAA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_80b/Docs/, (20150410), XP050949706 [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [03.4]; figure 4 * [A] 2-7,10-15 | [XA] - HTC, "Discussion on HARQ for LAA-LTE", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20150209 - 20150213, (20150131), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-150525, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_80/Docs/, (20150131), XP050949039 [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * [A] 2-7,10-15 |