EP3936046 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ASSESSING EAR PATHOLOGIES IN A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIWALE, Sujitkumar Sureshrao 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CHAKRABARTI, Biswaroop 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
RADHAKRISHNAN, Ravindranath 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
JOHNSON, Mark Thomas 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
BERA, Deep 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20185050.0 | 09.07.2020 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936046 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/11, A61B5/12, G16H50/20 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
A61B5/0057 (EP);
A61B5/12 (EP,US);
A61B1/227 (US);
A61B5/1123 (EP);
A61B5/6817 (EP,US);
A61B5/7267 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP);
A61B2560/0257 (EP);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0247 (EP,US);
A61B2562/029 (EP,US);
A61B5/1128 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG VON OHRENERKRANKUNGEN IN EINEM SUBJEKT | [2022/02] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ASSESSING EAR PATHOLOGIES IN A SUBJECT | [2022/02] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ÉVALUER LES PATHOLOGIES DE L'OREILLE CHEZ UN SUJET | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/51] | 02.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH10127670 (MATSUMOTO TOSHIHIKO, et al) [X] 1,5,11,15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0031]; figures 1-6 * [I] 2-4,6-10,12-14; | [A]US2002143242 (NEMIROVSKI GUERMAN G [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0047] - [0082]; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]US2007112290 (MORITA MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,5,11,15 * paragraphs [0095] - [0099]; figures 5,6 * [I] 2-4,6-10,12-14; | [A]US2018220904 (LEBOEUF STEVEN FRANCIS [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0066] - [0151]; figures 1-19 *; | [XI]CN110584609 (BEIJING ZHUOCHI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-5,11,12,15 * sections "Background technique", "Example one";; figures 1-3 * [I] 6-10,13,14 | by applicant | - H. W. PAU et al., "Pressure changes in the human middle ear without opening the Eustachian tube", Acta Oto-Laryngologica,, (20090100), vol. 129, no. 11, pages 1182 - 1186 | - R. J. MARCHBANKS et al., "The effect of raised intracranial pressure on intracochlear fluid pressure: three case studies", Br JAudiol, (19870500), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 127 - 130 | - S. E. VOSSJ. J. ROSOWSKIS. N. MERCHANTW. T. PEAKE, "Middle-ear function with tympanic-membrane perforations. I. Measurements and mechanisms", J. Acoust. Soc. Am., (20010900), vol. 110, no. 3, doi:10.1121/1.1394195, pages 1432 - 1444, XP012002498 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.1394195 | - M. GAIHEDE, "Middle ear volume and pressure effects on tympanometric middle ear pressure determination: model experiments with special reference to secretory otitis media", Auris Nasus Larynx, (20000700), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 231 - 239 | - K. TAKEUCHI et al., "Viscoelastic properties of middle ear effusions from pediatric otitis media with effusion and their relation to gross appearance", Eur Arch Otorhinolaryngol, (19900100), vol. 247, no. 1, pages 60 - 62 |