EP3766598 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE BLOWING OF A BASIC OXYGEN FURNACE TUYERE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/03] | TUYERE FOR A BASIC OXYGEN FURNACE | ||
[2021/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, Pennsylvania 18195 / US | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKWANA, Anandkumar 1055 Cetronia Road Apt. N8 Breiningsville, PA Pennsylvania 18031 / US | 02 /
SANE, Anup Vasant 930 N. Cedar Crest Blvd. Allentown, PA Pennsylvania 18104 / US | 03 /
BUZINSKI, Michael David 4340 Still Court Slatington, PA Pennsylvania 18080 / US | 04 /
BURAGINO, Gregory J. 8944 Torrance Court Fogelsville, PA Pennsylvania 18051 / US | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20185446.0 | 13.07.2020 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | US201916514122 | 17.07.2019 Original published format: US201916514122 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3766598 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3766598 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22D1/00, C21C5/34, C21C5/35, C21C5/48, F27B3/22, F27D3/16 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
C21C5/35 (EP,BR);
C21C5/48 (EP,BR,CN,KR);
C21C5/5217 (KR);
C21C5/34 (EP,BR,US);
B22D1/005 (EP,BR);
C21B7/16 (US);
C21C5/32 (CN);
C21C5/4673 (US);
C21C7/072 (KR);
F27B3/225 (EP);
F27D27/00 (KR);
F27D3/16 (EP,US);
F27D99/0033 (KR);
F27D2003/164 (EP);
F27D2003/165 (EP);
F27D2003/167 (EP,US);
F27D2003/168 (EP);
F27D2027/002 (KR,US);
F27D2099/0036 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | B22D1/00, C21C5/34, C21C5/35, C21C5/48, F27B3/22, F27D3/16, F23D14/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG DES BLASENS EINES SAUERSTOFFOFENS TUYERE | [2021/38] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE BLOWING OF A BASIC OXYGEN FURNACE TUYERE | [2021/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONTROLE DU SOUFFLAGE D'UNE TUYERE DE FOUR À OXYGENE | [2021/38] |
Former [2021/03] | TUYERE FÜR EINEN SAUERSTOFFOFEN | ||
Former [2021/03] | TUYERE FOR A BASIC OXYGEN FURNACE | ||
Former [2021/03] | TUYÈRE POUR UN FOUR À OXYGÈNE | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 13.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2020 | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | MK | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IE | 13.07.2022 | LU | 13.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 13.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 13.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 13.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 13.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
LU | 13.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
LU | 13.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3920447 (SCHROEDER DAVID L, et al) [A] 4,5 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4249719 (BROTZMANN KARL [DE], et al) [A] 3 * figure 2 ** claim 10 *; | [XI]EP2047001 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 11 * * claim 5 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 56] , [0 64] , [0 68] * [I] 3,5-7; | [A]WO2016103196 (OUTOTEC FINLAND OY [FI]) [A] 5-7 * claims 20-23 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045] *; | [X]US2017356645 (MILLER TODD A [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 4, 5 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * | by applicant | US4417723 | US4758269 | US5329545 | US5458320 | - MILLS, KENNETH C. et al., "A review of slag splashing", ISIJ international, vol. 45, no. 5, (20050000), pages 619 - 633, URL: https://www.jstage.jstgo.jp/article/isijinternational/45/5/45-5_619/_pdf | - GUOGUANG, ZHAOHUSKEN, RAINERCAPPEL, JURGEN., "Experience with long BOF campaign life and TBM bottom stirring technology", Stahl und Eisen, (20120000), vol. 132, pages 61 - 78 | - FARMER LLACH DLANYI MWINCHESTER D., "Gas injection tuyere design and experience", 72nd Steelmaking Conference Proceedings, (19890000), pages 487 - 495 |