EP3909557 - STRETCHING DEVICE FOR STRETCHING EXERCISES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trenkle & Trenkle GbR Unterriedweg 3 87459 Pfronten / DE | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trenkle, Kilian 87459 Pfronten / DE | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20185620.0 | 14.07.2020 | [2021/46] | Priority number, date | DE202020102682U | 13.05.2020 Original published format: DE 202020102682 U | [2021/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909557 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3909557 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/02 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61H1/0292 (EP);
A61H1/0266 (EP);
A61H2201/0153 (EP);
A61H2201/0157 (EP);
A61H2201/0161 (EP);
A61H2201/0192 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] |
Former [2021/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DEHNUNGSGERÄT FÜR DEHNÜBUNGEN | [2021/46] | English: | STRETCHING DEVICE FOR STRETCHING EXERCISES | [2021/46] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉTIREMENT POUR EXERCICES D'ÉTIREMENT | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 17.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3119614 (BERRY DANIEL E); | [X]DE202014005212U (GERULLIS JAN PHILIPP [DE]); | [XI]US2018318631 (SIU ANDREW S P [CN]) | by applicant | US2009192022 |