EP3780734 - REREGISTRATION TO SLICES WITH MAPPED S-NSSAIS ALONE IN 5G SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Singapore Pte. Ltd. No. 1 Fusionopolis Walk No. 03-01 Solaris Singapore 138628 / SG | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEMI, Marko c/o Elektroniikkatie 16 Oulu / FI | 02 /
SITOMANIEMI, Jaakko c/o Elektroniikkatie 16 Oulu / FI | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20185969.1 | 15.07.2020 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | US201962886440P | 14.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962886440 P | US201962887048P | 15.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962887048 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780734 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3780734 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H04W36/0011 (EP,CN,US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W60/00 (CN,US);
H04W8/08 (US);
H04W88/06 (CN);
H04W36/13 (EP,CN,US);
H04W84/042 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NEUREGISTRIERUNG FÜR SLICES MIT ABGEBILDETEN S-NSSAIS ALLEIN IN 5G-SYSTEM | [2021/07] | English: | REREGISTRATION TO SLICES WITH MAPPED S-NSSAIS ALONE IN 5G SYSTEM | [2021/07] | French: | RÉENREGISTREMENT SUR TRANCHES AYANT DES S-NSSAIS MAPPÉES AUTONOMES DANS UN SYSTÈME 5G | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 12.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2018270877 (LEE HOYEON [KR], et al); |