EP3809045 - A METHOD FOR COOKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states June Life, Inc. 1620 Folsom Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states June Life, Inc. 649 Front St, Suite 100 San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHOGAL, Nikhil June Life, Inc. 649 Front St, Suite 100 San Francisco, California 94111 / US | 02 /
VAN HORN, Matthew June Life, Inc. 649 Front St, Suite 100 San Francisco, California 94111 / US | 03 /
PARK, Seunghoon June Life, Inc. 649 Front St, Suite 100 San Francisco, California 94111 / US | 04 /
SILALINGAM, Ravishankar June Life, Inc. 649 Front St, Suite 100 San Francisco, California 94111 / US | 05 /
CLARK, Christopher Russell June Life, Inc. 649 Front St, Suite 100 San Francisco, California 94111 / US | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Higgs, Jonathan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20186150.7 | 05.05.2016 | [2021/16] | Priority number, date | US201562157325P | 05.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562157325 P | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809045 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, H05B6/68, A47J37/06, F24C3/12, F24C15/00, H05B1/02, F24C7/06, A23L5/10, H04W4/80, A47J36/32 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
F24C7/086 (EP,US);
A47J37/0623 (CN,US);
A23L5/15 (EP,US);
A23L5/17 (EP,US);
A47J36/321 (EP,US);
A47J37/0664 (CN,US);
F24C15/008 (US);
F24C3/124 (US);
F24C7/085 (EP,US);
F24C7/087 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H05B1/0263 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOCHVERFAHREN | [2021/16] | English: | A METHOD FOR COOKING | [2021/16] | French: | UNE MÉTHODE DE CUISSON | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 15.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16790106.5 / EP3292738 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19828333 (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 6 - column 3, line 29 *; | [A]EP1179711 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020] *; | [A]JP2004187778 (RINNAI KK) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US7102107 (CHAPMAN PETER A [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006128696 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 4 *; | [A]EP1746350 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0055]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2007042091 (RUND RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2007215599 (KAHLER ANDREW [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2149755 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] - [0 49]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2011002677 (COCHRAN DON W [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014203012 (CORONA ENRIQUE [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0123] * |