EP3941092 - FITTING OF HEARING DEVICE DEPENDENT ON PROGRAM ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonova AG Laubisrütistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hildebrand, Nicola 8610 Uster / CH | 02 /
Kühnel, Volker 8708 Männedorf / CH | 03 /
Boretzki, Michael 8630 Rüti / CH | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Qip Patentanwälte Dr. Kuehn & Partner mbB Goethestraße 8 80336 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20186216.6 | 16.07.2020 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941092 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H04R25/70 (EP,US);
H04R25/305 (US);
H04R25/50 (US);
H04R25/554 (EP);
H04R2225/41 (EP);
H04R2225/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINPASSUNG EINES HÖRGERÄTS IN ABHÄNGIGKEIT DER PROGRAMMAKTIVITÄT | [2022/03] | English: | FITTING OF HEARING DEVICE DEPENDENT ON PROGRAM ACTIVITY | [2022/03] | French: | AJUSTEMENT DE DISPOSITIF AUDITIF DÉPENDANT DE L'ACTIVITÉ D'UN PROGRAMME | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/52] | 10.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |