EP3760265 - RESPIRATORY HUMIDIFICATION SYSTEM AND HEATER PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland 2013 / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGESS, Russel William c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki 2013 Auckland / NZ | 02 /
BARKER, Dean Antony c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki 2013 Auckland / NZ | 03 /
HERMEZ, Laith Adeeb c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki 2013 Auckland / NZ | 04 /
LAWSON, Joel Michael c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki 2013 Auckland / NZ | 05 /
KIRTON, Robert Stuart c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki 2013 Auckland / NZ | 06 /
O'DONNELL, Kevin Peter c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki 2013 Auckland / NZ | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20186327.1 | 03.09.2015 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201462045358P | 03.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462045358 P | US201562213534P | 02.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562213534 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3760265 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3760265 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/16, A61M16/00, A61M16/10, A61M16/14, // A61M16/20 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61M16/16 (EP,US);
A61M16/1045 (GB);
A61M16/161 (US);
A61M16/022 (GB);
A61M16/024 (EP,US);
A61M16/1075 (GB);
A61M16/109 (EP,US);
A61M16/147 (EP,US);
A61M39/24 (US);
A61M16/106 (EP,US);
A61M16/208 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0033 (US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEATMUNGS- UND BEFEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM SOWIE HEIZPLATTE | [2021/01] | English: | RESPIRATORY HUMIDIFICATION SYSTEM AND HEATER PLATE | [2021/01] | French: | SYSTÈME D'HUMIDIFICATION RESPIRATOIRE ET PLAQUE DE CHAUFFAGE | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 23.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15838898.3 / EP3188782 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6095505 (MILLER KENNETH G [US]) [X] 1,3-12 * column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 28 * * column 2, line 52 - column 5, line 59 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 1-13,19 [I] 1-13; | [XYI]US2007137646 (WEINSTEIN LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0122] * * figures 2-16 * [Y] 1-13,19 [I] 1-13; | [XY]WO2008095245 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-13,19 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0085] * * figures 1-10 * [Y] 1-13,19; | [Y]AU2008202098 (RESMED LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-13,19 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0076] * * figures 1-4 *; | [XYI]WO2009049909 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1,3-12 * page 1, line 3 - line 36 * * page 2, line 36 - page 9, line 24 * * figures 1-8 * [Y] 1-13,19 [I] 1-13; | [Y]US2009320840 (KLASEK PAUL JAN [AU], et al) [Y] 19 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0144] * * figures 1-15 *; | [XYI]DE102009014746 (LANG VOLKER [DE]) [X] 1,3-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * figures 6, 7 * [Y] 1-13,19 [I] 1-13; | [Y]US2011023874 (BATH ANDREW RODERICK [AU], et al) [Y] 19 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0163] * * figures 1-33 *; | [XYI]US2012125334 (KORNEFF NEIL ALEX [US], et al) [X] 1,3-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] * * figure 3 * [Y] 1-13,19 [I] 1-13; | [XYI]WO2012080941 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-12 * paragraph [01] - paragraph [11] * * paragraph [21] - paragraph [67] * * figures 1-8 * [Y] 1-13,19 [I] 1-13; | [XYI]WO2012100291 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [00117] * * paragraph [00137] - paragraph [00206] * * figures 1a-11 * [Y] 1-13,19 [I] 13; | [Y]WO2012171072 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 19 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [00115] * * figures 1 to 15-2 *; | [E]WO2015135040 (RESMED LTD [AU]) [E] 1-12,19 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0453] ** figures 1A-34 * | by applicant | US6769431 |