EP3822666 - LIGHT BARRIER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuze electronic GmbH + Co. KG In der Braike 1 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feller, Bernhard Am Fladerlach 10 86316 Friedberg / DE | 02 /
Koperski, Joachim Putzbrunner Str. 126A 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 03 /
Aldiek, Norbert Im Doschler 25 73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | 04 /
Hörderich, Johann Kirchenweg 5a 82291 Mammendorf / DE | 05 /
Olbrich, Sebastian Abbachstr. 26 80992 München / DE | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2021/20] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwalt Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | Application number, filing date | 20186391.7 | 17.07.2020 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | DE201920106396U | 15.11.2019 Original published format: DE 202019106396 U | [2021/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822666 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3822666 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/20, F16P3/14 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
F16P3/144 (EP);
G01V8/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | LICHTSCHRANKENANORDNUNG | [2021/20] | English: | LIGHT BARRIER DEVICE | [2021/20] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE BARRIÈRES LUMINEUSES | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 10.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0598630 (SCIENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-10,12,15 * claims 1-3 * * column 3, line 11 - line 35 * * column 4, line 41 - line 50 * * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 10 * * column 6, line 42 - line 44 * * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 5 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 4 [I] 11,13,14; | [YA]DE4423264 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * claims 1, 11 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 5 * * column 6, line 15 - line 68 * * figures 1, 3 * [A] 4; | [YA]JP2005049172 (SUNX LTD) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * claims 1, 3, 7-10 * * page 9 * * paragraph [0086] * * figure 1 *[A] 4 |