EP3797575 - COMBINE HARVESTER WITH DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/13] | COMBINE HARVESTER AND DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM FOR SAME | ||
[2023/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bußmann, Jens Osterfeldstraße 5a 49179 Ostercappeln / DE | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 20186666.2 | 20.07.2020 | [2021/13] | Priority number, date | DE201910125645 | 24.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019125645 | [2021/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797575 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3797575 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/127, A01F12/58, // A01F12/18 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
A01D41/1273 (EP);
A01D41/127 (US);
A01F12/18 (US);
A01F12/58 (EP);
A01D75/282 (US);
A01F12/448 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/13] | A01D41/127, A01F12/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MÄHDRESCHER MIT FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEM | [2023/10] | English: | COMBINE HARVESTER WITH DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM | [2023/10] | French: | MOISSONNEUSE-BATTEUSE AVEC SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE AU CONDUCTEUR | [2023/10] |
Former [2021/13] | MÄHDRESCHER UND FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEM DAFÜR | ||
Former [2021/13] | COMBINE HARVESTER AND DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM FOR SAME | ||
Former [2021/13] | MOISSONNEUSE-BATTEUSE ET SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA CONDUITE ASSOCIÉ | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 30.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | IE | 20.07.2023 | LU | 20.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.07.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.07.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4406140 (CLAAS OHG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 27 - line 68 *; | [A]DE10307705 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0038] *; | [AD]DE102006015152 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * figure 1 ** paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] *; | [A]US2016081271 (MOTT CAMERON R [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]EP3494774 (CNH IND BELGIUM NV [BE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 21] - [0028] * | by applicant | DE102006015152 | EP3076248 |