EP3757126 - METHODS OF TREATING PSORIATIC ARTHRITIS USING IL-17 ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MPOFU, Shepard Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 02 /
RICHARDS, Hanno Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 03 /
THANGAVELU, Karthinathan Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 04 /
MACHACEK, Matthias Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Fredh, Fredrik Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 20187001.1 | 04.11.2011 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201041053310P | 05.11.2010 Original published format: US 41053310 P | [2021/01] | Previously filed application, date | EP20190162707 | 04.11.2011 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757126 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24, A61K39/395, A61K31/519 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61K39/3955 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/39591 (EP,IL);
A61K45/06 (IL,KR,US);
A61P17/06 (EP,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P37/00 (EP,IL);
A61P37/02 (EP,IL);
A61P37/06 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C07K16/244 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/55 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR);
C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 21.07.2020 | ME | 21.07.2020 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PSORIASUS-ARTHRITIS MIT IL-17 ANTAGONISTEN | [2021/01] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING PSORIATIC ARTHRITIS USING IL-17 ANTAGONISTS | [2021/01] | French: | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE LA POLYARTHRITE PSORIASIQUE AU MOYEN D'ANTAGONISTES D'IL-17 | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 09.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11778903.2 / EP2635303 | EP16163440.7 / EP3111954 | EP19162707.4 / EP3542820 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.09.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.09.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006013107 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 42, column 43 * * sequences 7-10 *; | [Y] - MARK GENOVESE ET AL, "Secukinumab (AIN457), a novel monoclonal antibody targeting IL-17A demonstrates efficacy in active rheumatoid arthritis patients despite stable methotrexate treatment: Results of a phase IIb study", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM; ABSTRACTS OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF RHEUMATOLOGY & ASSOCIATION OF RHEUMATOLOGY HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US; ATLANTA, GEORGIA, USA, vol. 62, no. Suppl. 10, doi:10.1002/ART.30166, ISSN 0004-3591, (20101001), (20101228), XP008147986 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.30166 | [Y] - ERIK LUBBERTS, "Th17 cytokines and arthritis", SEMINARS IN IMMUNOPATHOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20100204), vol. 32, no. 1, ISSN 1863-2300, pages 43 - 53, XP019800827 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - Anonymous, "History of Changes for Study: NCT00809614- Efficacy of AIN457 in Adults (18-65 Years) With Psoriatic Arthritis", ClinicalTrials.gov Archive, (20100429), pages 1 - 4, URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/history/NCT00809614?A=5&B=5&C=merged#StudyPageTop, (20200123), XP055661176 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - NOVARTIS, "View of NCT00809159 on 2010_06_22", INTERNET CITATION, (20100622), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/archive/NCT00809159/2010_06_22, (20160907), XP002761819 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [YP] - MCINNES I ET AL, "Anti-Interleukin 17A Monoclonal Antibody Secukinumab Reduces Signs and Symptoms of Psoriatic Arthritis in a 24-Week Multicenter, Double-Blind, Randomized, Placebo-Controlled Trial", INTERNET CITATION, ISSN 1529-0131, (20111104), URL: http://www.blackwellpublishing.com/acrmeeting/abstract.asp?MeetingID=781&id=95525, (20160914), XP002761820 [YP] 1-8 * the whole document * | [YP] - BARALIAKOS XENOFON ET AL, "Interleukin-17A Blockade with Secukinumab Reduces Spinal Inflammation in Patients with Ankylosing Spondylitis As Early As Week 6, As Detected by Magnetic Resonance Imaging", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM; 75TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF RHEUMATOLOGY/46TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETIN; CHICAGO, IL, USA; NOVEMBER 04 -09, 2011, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, US, (20111101), vol. 63, no. 10, Suppl. S, ISSN 0004-3591, page S972, XP009170121 [YP] 1-8 * the whole document * | [YP] - DOMINIQUE BAETEN ET AL, "The anti-IL17A monoclonal antibody secukinumab (AIN457) showed good safety and efficacy in the treatment of active ankylosing spondylitis", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (20101130), vol. 62, no. 12, pages 3840 - 3841, XP055660219 [YP] 1-8 * the whole document * | [YP] - Stacey Ness, "Surveying the Pipeline of Biologics to Treat Inflammatory Conditions", (20110912), URL: https://www.pharmacytimes.com/publications/issue/2011/August2011/Surveying-the-Pipeline-of-Biologics-to-Treat-Inflammatory-Conditions-, (20200121), XP055660252 [YP] 1-8 * the whole document * | [AP] - Anonymous, "History of Changes for Study: NCT01358175 Efficacy at 16 Weeks and Long Term Safety, Tolerability and Efficacy up to 2 Years of Secukinumab (AIN457) in Patients W Ankylosing Spondylitis (AS)", None (earliest Version on record) 2 October 20 Reported Adverse Events, Study Status, Outcome Measures and Baseline Characteristics Study NCT01358175 Submitted Date, (20111020), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/history/NCT01358175?V_2, (20201030), XP055745693 [AP] 1-8 * the whole document * | [T] - DOMINIQUE BAETEN ET AL, "Secukinumab, an Interleukin-17A Inhibitor, in Ankylosing Spondylitis", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20151224), vol. 373, no. 26, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1505066, pages 2534 - 2548, XP055661305 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1505066 | [T] - JOHN COLLETT ED - AULTON M E (ED) 2, "DOSAGE REGIMENS", PHARMACEUTICS. THE SCIENCE OF DOSAGE FORM DESIGN ED. 2, CHURCHILL LIVIGSTONE, (20010101), no. 2nd Ed, ISBN 978-0-443-05517-1, pages 275 - 288, XP003030862 |