EP3749048 - METHODS AND TERMINAL DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Hai c/o GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 20187156.3 | 20.07.2016 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749048 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/27, // H04W76/10 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
H04W76/27 (EP);
H04W76/10 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W72/535 (CN,US);
H04W72/1273 (CN,US);
H04B17/382 (US);
H04L5/0094 (CN,US);
H04W36/008375 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W48/12 (US);
H04W72/00 (US);
H04W72/0446 (CN,US);
H04W72/0453 (CN,US);
H04W72/23 (CN,KR);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W36/00838 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/20 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] |
Former [2020/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN | [2020/50] | English: | METHODS AND TERMINAL DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA | [2020/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 09.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16909187.3 / EP3457807 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN101965037 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO); | [I]US2012281566 (PELLETIER GHYSLAIN [CA], et al); | [I]EP2536203 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH [CN]); | [I]CN103179672 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [I]EP2747508 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH [CN]); | [I]US2016135247 (OZTURK OZCAN [US], et al); |