EP3771110 - DUAL CHANNEL INTERMEDIATE FREQUENCY COMBINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Collins, Inc. 400 Collins Road NE Cedar Rapids, IA 52498 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHOLENSKY, Michael C. 1640 Hunters Creek Way Mario, IA 52302 / US | 02 /
PAULSEN, Lee M. 3601 Otis Road SE Cedar Rapids, IA 52403 / US | 03 /
CAMPBELL, Thomas B. 312 Linden Terrace SE Cedar Rapids, IA 52403 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 20187241.3 | 22.07.2020 | [2021/04] | Priority number, date | US201916518085 | 22.07.2019 Original published format: US201916518085 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3771110 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
H04B1/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEIKANAL-ZWISCHENFREQUENZKOMBINIERER | [2021/04] | English: | DUAL CHANNEL INTERMEDIATE FREQUENCY COMBINER | [2021/04] | French: | COMBINATEUR DE FRÉQUENCE INTERMÉDIAIRE À DOUBLE CANAL | [2021/04] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US9647748 (MITCHELL JAMES P [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 24, line 19 - column 25, line 58; figure 16 *; | [A]US2006128336 (WALTMAN STEVE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2010060517 (NICHOLS RICHARD W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figure 4 * |