EP3785836 - WIRE ELECTRICAL DISCHARGE MACHINE AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAOKA, Masahide c/o FANUC CORPORATION 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi, 401-0597 / JP | 02 /
HIRAGA, Kaoru c/o FANUC CORPORATION 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi, 401-0597 / JP | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 20187876.6 | 27.07.2020 | [2021/09] | Priority number, date | JP20190140461 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019140461 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785836 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/06, B23H7/10 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
B23H7/065 (EP);
B23H7/02 (CN);
B23H7/20 (EP,US);
B23H1/10 (US);
B23H11/00 (CN);
B23H7/101 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] |
Former [2021/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE DRAHTERODIERMASCHINE UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/09] | English: | WIRE ELECTRICAL DISCHARGE MACHINE AND CONTROL METHOD | [2021/09] | French: | MACHINE À DÉCHARGE ÉLECTRIQUE À FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 10.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5453592 (TAKEUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 7, lines 17-26 ** column 7, lines 41-57 *; | [XAY]JP2000141133 (HITACHI VIA MECHANICS LTD) [X] 1,3-6,9,10 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] * [A] 8 [Y] 2,7; | [Y]EP1607161 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,7 * paragraph [0035] * | by applicant | JP2004074364 |