EP3761421 - FUEL CELL ASSEMBLY AND ASSOCIATED METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough LE11 3GB / GB | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARMAZYN, Harry John c/o Intelligent Energy Limited, Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road, Loughborough Leicestershire, LE11 3GB / GB | 02 /
KUPCHO, Kevin c/o Intelligent Energy Limited, Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road, Loughborough Leicestershire, LE11 3GB / GB | 03 /
ASHTON, Sean c/o Intelligent Energy Limited, Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road, Loughborough Leicestershire, LE11 3GB / GB | 04 /
ELLIOTT, Zachary c/o Intelligent Energy Limited, Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road, Loughborough Leicestershire, LE11 3GB / GB | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Keltie LLP No. 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Creation IP Ltd Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20187925.1 | 07.12.2015 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | GB20140021778 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: GB 201421778 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3761421 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04828, H01M8/04955, H01M8/24, H01M8/0202, H01M8/04223, H01M8/0432, H01M8/0438, H01M8/0444, H01M8/04492, H01M8/04537, H01M8/04701, H01M8/04791, H01M8/04228, H01M8/04225, H01M8/04302, H01M8/04858 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H01M8/0202 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H01M8/04302 (EP,GB,KR,US);
H01M8/04873 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
H01M8/04865 (GB,US);
H01M50/572 (GB);
H01M8/04225 (EP,GB,KR,US);
H01M8/04228 (EP,GB,KR,US);
H01M8/04238 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H01M8/04246 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H01M8/04303 (US);
H01M8/0432 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H01M8/0438 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
H01M8/0444 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H01M8/04492 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H01M8/04544 (GB,US);
H01M8/04552 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
H01M8/04559 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H01M8/04567 (GB);
H01M8/04582 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
H01M8/04701 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H01M8/04753 (US);
H01M8/0488 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H01M8/04888 (GB);
H01M8/04955 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
H01M8/24 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
H01M8/2484 (US);
H01M2200/00 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENANORDNUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB | [2021/01] | English: | FUEL CELL ASSEMBLY AND ASSOCIATED METHOD OF OPERATION | [2021/01] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 02.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15820572.4 / EP3231030 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]JP2000277136 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,8-12,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0014] , [0017] , [0018] , [0020] * * figures 1,3 * [A] 13-15 [Y] 3-7,16 [I] 2; | [XAY]US2003211372 (ADAMS WILLIAM A [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,8-11,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0255] , [0257] , [0258] , [0260] , [0261] , [0263] - [0266] - [0279] - [0281] * * figures 2a,2b * [A] 12-16 [Y] 3-7; | [YA]US2003224227 (VOSS HENRY H [CA], et al) [Y] 16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0023] - [0028] * * figure 1 *[A] 1-15,17; | [XYI]US2004137292 (TAKEBE YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0033] , [0043] , [0094] - [0096] - [0105] - [0107] - [0272] - [0277] * * figures 3,4 * * example 9 * [Y] 3-7 [I] 2; | [XYI]US2008090111 (KIM YOUNG-JAE [KR], et al) [X] 1,8-15,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0015] , [0026] - [0037] * * figures 3,4 * [Y] 3-7,16 [I] 2; | [YA]JP2008186673 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0040] - [0053] * * figures 1,3 * [A] 1-5,8-17; | [XAY]US2008220294 (MILLER DANIEL P [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0032] , [0033] , [0045] , [0048] * * figures 1,2,8 * [A] 6,7,13-15 [Y] 16; | [XAYI]US2011229783 (ROBB GARY M [US], et al) [X] 1,8,11-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] , [0025] , [0031] - [0035] - [0040] * * figures 2,3A,3B * [A] 9,10 [Y] 3-7 [I] 2; | [XAYI]US2012237800 (ORIOL JEAN [FR], et al) [X] 1,8-12,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0051] , [0053] - [0057] - [0060] - [0062] * * figure 3 * [A] 13-16 [Y] 3-7 [I] 2 |