EP3795272 - NUT-SHAPED FCC MAGNET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-70 Konan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8224 / JP | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamura, Nobuyuki Neomax Engineering Co., Ltd. Suita Works 1-3-1, Kishibenaka Suita-shi Osaka, Osaka 564-0002 / JP | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 20188409.5 | 29.07.2020 | [2021/12] | Priority number, date | JP20190171807 | 20.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019171807 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3795272 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B21J1/06, B21J5/02, B21K1/56, B21K1/64, B21K1/68, B21K1/70, F16B37/00, G01P3/487, C21D6/00 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
B21K1/64 (EP);
B21J1/06 (EP);
B21J5/025 (EP);
B21K1/56 (EP);
B21K1/68 (EP);
B21K1/705 (EP);
C21D6/002 (EP);
C21D6/007 (EP);
C22C38/30 (EP);
G01P3/487 (EP);
H01F41/0253 (EP);
H01F7/021 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUTTERFÖRMIGER FCC-MAGNET UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/18] | English: | NUT-SHAPED FCC MAGNET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2021/12] | French: | AIMANT FCC EN FORME D'ÉCROU ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/12] |
Former [2021/12] | MUTTERNFÖRMIGER FCC-MAGNET UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | Examination procedure | 07.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 07.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/04] | 06.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2513920 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 48 * * column 4, lines 18-36 *; | [Y]JPH09192773 (ASAHI SANAC KK) [Y] 1-15 * figure - *; | [YD]JP2001172751 (HITACHI METALS LTD, et al) [YD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] - [0031] *; | [Y]JP2005103637 (SAKAMURA MACH CO LTD) [Y] 1-15* figure - *; | [YD]WO2018105692 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0061]; figure - * | by applicant | JPH05298627 | JPH10206447 | JP2001172751 | US2017090191 | WO2018105692 |