EP3764692 - DEVICE-TO-DEVICE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Lilei c/o Panasonic R&D Center China Co. Ld. 6th Floor, Tower C Office Park, No.5 Jinghua South Street, Chaoyang District Beijing, 100020 / CN | 02 /
BASU MALLICK, Prateek c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
SUZUKI, Hidetoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
LOEHR, Joachim c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 05 /
HOSHINO, Masayuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 20188652.0 | 26.09.2014 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764692 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04W76/23, H04W72/02 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
H04W76/23 (EP,US);
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04W36/033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DRAHTLOSEN VORRICHTUNG-ZU-VORRICHTUNG-KOMMUNIKATION UND BENUTZERGERÄT | [2021/02] | English: | DEVICE-TO-DEVICE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ENTRE DISPOSITIFS ET ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 22.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14902505.8 / EP3198933 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |