EP3945195 - A GLAZING ASSEMBLY SET AND A METHOD OF MOUNTING THEREOF IN A BUILDING FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAQUET, Erwan 60200 COMPIEGNE / FR | 02 /
CHUDA, Katarzyna 92600 ASNIERES SUR SEINE / FR | [2022/05] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche B.P. 135 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2022/05] | Application number, filing date | 20188943.3 | 31.07.2020 | [2022/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3945195 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E06B1/60 | [2022/05] | CPC: |
E06B1/60 (EP);
E06B2003/26321 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERGLASUNGSANORDNUNGSSATZ UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN MONTAGE AN EINEM GEBÄUDERAHMEN | [2022/05] | English: | A GLAZING ASSEMBLY SET AND A METHOD OF MOUNTING THEREOF IN A BUILDING FRAME | [2022/05] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE VITRAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE DANS UNE STRUCTURE DE BÂTIMENT | [2022/05] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/04] | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3668808 (PERINA JOSEPH) [X] 1,2,12,13,15 * column 1, line 39 - line 52; figure - * [I] 3-11,14; | [XI]FR2141329 (AMERICAN VELCRO INC) [X] 1,2,11-13,15 * page 3, line 12 - line 27 * [I] 3-10,14; | [XI]US3745709 (PERINA J) [X] 1,2,12,13,15 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 29; figure - * [I] 3-11,14; | [A]CN111227448 (WUXI PAIHO TEXTILES CO LTD) [A] 4-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2279921 | JP2003074265 | GB2330857 | US2015027017 |